Thomas v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Kroner Thomas
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02942
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING SEPTEMBER 21, 2021 STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING. It is hereby ORDERED that: (1) The monthly status conference will be conducted remotely via Zoom, and shall begin at 9:00 am EDT on September 21, 2021. (2) The hearing on Defendants' 89 Motion to Dismiss shall be conducted in person and remotely via Zoom. The hearing shall begin immediately following the monthly status conference. (3) Only essential attorneys involved in the briefing and arguments for the Motion to Dismiss or with an active role in the September status conference may be present in court on September 21, 2021. All others should attend virtually via Zoom. Zoom link: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606260573 Meeting ID: 160 626 0573 Passcode: 123456 Dial by your location: +1 669 254 5252 (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 (New York) +1 551 285 1373 +1 669 216 1590 (San Jose) Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/15/2021. (Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.) (cmd)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jasmine Kroner Thomas. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons, #4 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Barfield, William)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Status Conference held on 8/23/2021. The Court held its monthly status conference. The parties are directed to file a proposed scheduling order for the September 21st status conference and motion hearing two weeks prior to the hearing. See transcript for details. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(tcc)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021. (rjc)
July 23, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (rjc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jasmine Kroner Thomas. Direct File MDL- USDC Northern District of California (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11127030) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Kroner Thomas
Represented By: William H. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?