Lundy v. Hodges et al
Plaintiff: Alpha Lundy
Defendant: Raymond Hodges, Ready Every Day Transport, LLC doing business as Donald Lee Nance, Canal Insurance Company and GEICO General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv03018
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss terminating GEICO General Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/23/2021. (ah)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Dismiss GEICO as Underinsured Motorist by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gupta, Sheree)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE P Responses to D RFAs by Alpha Lundy.(Dozier, J. W.)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4(A) by Raymond Hodges.(Weston, William)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request for an extension of the discovery deadline in this case is GRANTED, and the discovery deadline in this case is April 4, 2022. Any Motions for Summary Judgment must be filed by May 4, 2022, and if no Motions for Summary Judgment are filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order will be due on May 4, 2022. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on May 5, 2022, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/31/2021. (ah)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Petitioner Sean Hickey's #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/31/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
August 30, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Hickey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11216345). Attorney Sean G. Hickey added appearing on behalf of Alpha Lundy (cdg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures by Canal Insurance Company, Raymond Hodges, Ready Every Day Transport, LLC.(O'Daniel, Clay)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Canal Insurance Company, Raymond Hodges, Ready Every Day Transport, LLC. (O'Daniel, Clay)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #4 Crossclaim by Canal Insurance Company, Raymond Hodges, Ready Every Day Transport, LLC.(O'Daniel, Clay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Hickey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11216345).by Alpha Lundy. (Dozier, J. W.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Sean G. Hickey. Clerk to follow-up by 8/26/2021. (cdg)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 GEICO General Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Raymond Hodges with Jury Demand by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Demand)(Gupta, Sheree) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2021 Clerks Notation re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canal Insurance Company, Raymond Hodges, Ready Every Day Transport, LLC.(O'Daniel, Clay)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Canal Insurance Company, Raymond Hodges, Ready Every Day Transport, LLC. Discovery ends on 1/3/2022.(O'Daniel, Clay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ready Every Day Transport, LLC, Raymond Hodges, Canal Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11139339) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundy v. Hodges et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpha Lundy
Represented By: J. W. David Dozier
Represented By: Sean G. Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Hodges
Represented By: Clay Seaton O'Daniel
Represented By: William Scott Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ready Every Day Transport, LLC doing business as Donald Lee Nance
Represented By: Clay Seaton O'Daniel
Represented By: William Scott Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canal Insurance Company
Represented By: Clay Seaton O'Daniel
Represented By: William Scott Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Sheree Nicole Sheppe Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?