Tate v. Lessors Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rolanda Tate
Defendant: Lessors Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut and Joseph Vargovich
Case Number: 1:2021cv03157
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 28 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/13/2021 - 10/13/2021, 12/6/2021-12/21/2021, 1/17/2022-1/21/2022, 1/30/2022-2/2/2022, 3/1/2022-3/5/2022, by Joseph Wilson. (Wilson, Joseph)
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 Initial Disclosures by Lessors Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Joseph Vargovich. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A, C and E)(Stojanovic, Sandro)
September 30, 2021 Filing 26 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Justin Dunn filed by Rolanda Tate (Wilson, Joseph)
September 29, 2021 Filing 25 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Justin Dunn filed by Rolanda Tate (Wilson, Joseph)
September 22, 2021 Filing 24 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/7, 10/8, 10/10, 10/11, 10/12, 10/22, 10/23, 10/24, by Sandro Stojanovic. (Stojanovic, Sandro)
September 14, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Stojanovic, Sandro) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Lessors Inc..(Stojanovic, Sandro) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Joseph Vargovich.(Stojanovic, Sandro) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #19 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties have requested eight months of discovery. The Court grants the parties' request for additional discovery; however, the Court does not anticipate granting any additional requests to extend discovery. Discovery ends on 5/24/2022. Motions due by 6/24/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2022. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/13/2021. (cmd)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lessors Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Joseph Vargovich. (Stojanovic, Sandro)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 Withdrawal of Motion #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Joseph Vargovich, Lessors Inc. filed by Lessors Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Joseph Vargovich. (Stojanovic, Sandro)
September 1, 2021 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rolanda Tatewith Jury Demand filed by Rolanda Tate.(Wilson, Joseph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Lessors Inc..(Stojanovic, Sandro)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Vargovich. Joseph Vargovich waiver mailed on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Stojanovic, Sandro)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lessors Inc.. Lessors Inc. waiver mailed on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Stojanovic, Sandro)
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lessors Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Joseph Vargovich identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp, Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Group Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Travelers Company, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Stojanovic, Sandro)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Lessors Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Joseph Vargovich. (Stojanovic, Sandro)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Joseph Vargovich.(Stojanovic, Sandro) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut.(Stojanovic, Sandro) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Lessors Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/24/2022.(Stojanovic, Sandro) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Rolanda Tate. Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Wilson, Joseph)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/9/21. (rlb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Production of Documents to Defendant Joseph Vargovich by Rolanda Tate.(eop)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Productio of Documents to Defendant Lessor's Inc, by Rolanda Tate.(eop)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE: Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure by Rolanda Tate (eop)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Disclosures by Rolanda Tate.(eop)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (eop)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rolanda Tate. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number BGANDC-11159823) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate v. Lessors Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolanda Tate
Represented By: Joseph Wilson
Represented By: Nicole Marla Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lessors Inc.
Represented By: Scott Harlan Moulton
Represented By: Sandro Stojanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Scott Harlan Moulton
Represented By: Sandro Stojanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Vargovich
Represented By: Scott Harlan Moulton
Represented By: Sandro Stojanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?