Brown v. Great West Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Brown
Defendant: Ramon Lezama, Great West Casualty Insurance Company and Lexington Intermodal, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03159
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion fo rFees and Costs under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Order 3.3.20, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Motion, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Order 4.23.21)(Sharpes, Dustin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Sharpes on behalf of Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC (Sharpes, Dustin)
September 30, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE Of Filing by Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC, Ramon Lezama re #1 Notice of Removal, Amendment to Notice (Stone, Matthew)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have to and including 10/01/2021 to file a response to plaintiff's motion to remand and motion for fees. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 09/15/2021. (jkb)
September 14, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #32 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion fo rFees and Costs under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) by Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension)(Stone, Matthew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Johnny Brown. (Kincaid, Meredith)
September 9, 2021 Filing 34 Return of Service Executed by Johnny Brown. (Kincaid, Meredith)
September 9, 2021 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Johnny Brown. Lexington Intermodal, LLC served on 9/2/2021. (Kincaid, Meredith)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #26 Motion to Stay. All pending pretrial deadlines are stayed pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF 32]. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on September 7, 2021. (ash)
September 3, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion fo rFees and Costs under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) by Johnny Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 12, 2021 email from Plaintiff's counsel to defense counsel)(Kincaid, Meredith)
September 3, 2021 Filing 31 Initial Disclosures by Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC.(Kalfus, Shawn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 30 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC. (Stone, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 29 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lexington Intermodal, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Lexington Intermodal/Cody B. Gillies)(jkb)
September 2, 2021 Filing 28 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Johnny Brown (Kincaid, Meredith)
September 2, 2021 Filing 27 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Johnny Brown (Kincaid, Meredith)
August 26, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay all Pretrial Deadlines by Johnny Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fayette Action Order Opening Default)(Kincaid, Meredith)
August 26, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE Of Filing Pending Motion for Reconsideration Originally Filed in Clayton County State Court by Johnny Brown re #14 Order from Other Court, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Pending Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clayton County State Court Docket)(Kincaid, Meredith)
August 20, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Johnny Brown (Njoku, Prince)
August 19, 2021 Filing 23 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Johnny Brown (Njoku, Prince)
August 19, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order (Stone, Matthew)
August 18, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Kincaid, Meredith)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Summerville, James)
August 18, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Cross, Anna)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Green Cross on behalf of Johnny Brown (Cross, Anna)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Charlotte Kincaid on behalf of Johnny Brown (Kincaid, Meredith)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC. (Kalfus, Shawn)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James Darren Summerville on behalf of Johnny Brown (Summerville, James)
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Wall Street Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate BROADWAY INTERMODAL, LLC, Other Affiliate Madison Intermodal, LLC, Other Affiliate Park Avenue Intermodal, LLC, Other Affiliate Wall Street Intermodal, LLC for Lexington Intermodal, LLC; Corporate Parent Republic International Corporation, Corporate Parent ORI Republic General Insurance Group, Inc. for Great West Casualty Insurance Company. (Stone, Matthew)
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Lexington Intermodal, LLC. (Stone, Matthew)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Great West Casualty Insurance Company. (Stone, Matthew)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order (Kalfus, Shawn)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Matthew Peter Stone replacing attorney William L. Tomlin. (Stone, Matthew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Lexington Intermodal, LLC.(Stone, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Great West Casualty Insurance Company.(Stone, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 5, 2021. (ash)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of State Court of Clayton County re: ORDERED that Lezama's motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED, plaintiff's claims against Lezama are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is hereby directed to ENTER JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF LEZAMA and against plaintiff. The case shall remain pending against the other defendants. (Filed 7/8/21 in Clayton County State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great West Casualty Insurance Company, Lexington Intermodal, LLC and Ramon Lezama with Jury Demand filed by Johnny Brown. (Filed in Clayton County State Court 10/30/20 and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ramon Lezama. (Filed in Clayton County State Court 9/18/20 and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Lexington Intermodal, LLC.(Filed in Clayton County State Court 9/18/20 and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Great West Casualty Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 1/3/2022. (Filed in Clayton County State Court 9/18/20 and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lexington Intermodal, LLC and Great West Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11160007) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Great West Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Brown
Represented By: Alfredo Rosa, II
Represented By: Prince N. Njoku
Represented By: ShaMiracle Shunwaii Johnson
Represented By: Anna Green Cross
Represented By: James Darren Summerville
Represented By: Meredith Charlotte Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Lezama
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Represented By: William L. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Represented By: William L. Tomlin
Represented By: Dustin Sharpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Intermodal, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Peter Stone
Represented By: Shawn N. Kalfus
Represented By: William L. Tomlin
Represented By: Dustin Sharpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?