Owners Insurance Company v. Alterman et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Michelle W. Alterman, Dale Bowman and Buckhead Parking Enforcement, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03190
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Michelle W. Alterman served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Brock, Chad)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Dale Bowman waiver mailed on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Brock, Chad)
August 17, 2021 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/16/2021. (tmf)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Mark H. Cohen for all further proceedings. District Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-3190-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/13/21. (rlh)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 3, 2021 through and including September 13, 2021; November 19, 2021 through and including November 29, 2021; December 24, 2021 through and including January 7, 2022, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Brock, Chad)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Buckhead Parking Enforcement, LLC. (eop)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dale Bowman. (eop)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Michelle W. Alterman. (eop)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11165339) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit -B -Affidavit of Service of Alterman, #3 Exhibit -C -Policy, #4 Exhibit -D -Reservation of Rights Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Alterman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Chad Michael Brock
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle W. Alterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckhead Parking Enforcement, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?