Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Drake et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Nicholas Drake, Shatara Churn, Thanh Vu and Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03215
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Pl's Discovery Requests to Defs Drake and Vu by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Clayton, Douglas)
October 1, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Pl's Discovery Requests to Defs Churn and TOHF by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Clayton, Douglas)
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 First Initial Disclosures by Thanh Vu.(Diamond, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2021 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Initial Disclosures on Behalf of Plaintiff by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Clayton, Douglas)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 First Initial Disclosures by Nicholas Drake.(Carnell, Jason)
October 1, 2021 Filing 24 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Clayton, Douglas)
September 30, 2021 Filing 23 Initial Disclosures by Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC..(Dishun, Alexandra)
September 30, 2021 Filing 22 Initial Disclosures by Shatara Churn.(Dishun, Alexandra)
September 24, 2021 Filing 21 Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 15-18, 2021, December 13-16, 2021, December 23-January 7, 2022, March 14-18, 2022, May 12-27, 2022, July 22-August 5, 2022, December 20, 2022-January 3, 2023, by Jeffrey D. Diamond. (Diamond, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2021 Filing 20 Application for Leave of Absence, by Jason Robert Carnell. (Carnell, Jason)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 First Certificate of Interested Persons by Nicholas Drake. (Carnell, Jason)
September 17, 2021 Clerks Notation re #19 First Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Nicholas Drake. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Robert Carnell on behalf of Nicholas Drake (Carnell, Jason)
September 16, 2021 Filing 17 First MOTION to Set Aside Default with Brief In Support by Nicholas Drake. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Carnell, Jason)
September 16, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant Nicholas Drake's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Nicholas Drake.(Carnell, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 16, 2021 Clerks Notation re #15 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC.. (Dishun, Alexandra)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Shatara Churn, Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC..(Dishun, Alexandra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 3, 2021 Clerks Notation re #13 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Thanh Vu. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons by Thanh Vu. (Diamond, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Thanh Vu. Discovery ends on 1/31/2022.(Diamond, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Nicholas Drake served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Clayton, Douglas)
August 27, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Shatara Churn answer due 9/15/2021; Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC. answer due 9/15/2021. (ceo)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Shatara Churn served on 8/25/2021, Answer due 09/15/2021; Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC. served on 8/25/2021, Answer due 09/15/2021. (Clayton, Douglas) Modified to edit text on 8/27/2021 (ceo).
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 2, 3, September 13-21, October 14-26, November 3-8, November 29-December 3, 2021, by Douglas Lee Clayton. (Clayton, Douglas) Modified to edit text on 8/24/2021 (ceo).
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Thanh Vu served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Clayton, Douglas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Clayton, Douglas)
August 10, 2021 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thanh Vu. (ayw)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC.. (ayw)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nicholas Drake. (ayw)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shatara Churn. (ayw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11167334) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - ROR Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Drake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Lee Clayton
Represented By: Justin Erik Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Drake
Represented By: Jason Robert Carnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shatara Churn
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Dishun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thanh Vu
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taste of Heavenly Foods, LLC.
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Dishun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?