Parker v. Smith Transport PA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carl Parker
Defendant: Smith Transport PA, Inc. doing business as Smith Transport, Inc. and Ellsworth Groce
Case Number: 1:2021cv03217
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of 9/27/21 motion hearing - hearing will be reset. (jkl)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Notice is hereby given that the Court RESCHEDULES a hearingpreviously noticed to be conducted on Monday, October 4, 2021 at 9:30a.m. to now take place on Monday September 27, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/22/2021. (cmd)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting for 10/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray, II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/16/2021. (cmd)
September 14, 2021 Submission of #5 MOTION to Set Aside Default to District Judge William M. Ray, II. (cmd)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Carl Parker re #8 Notice of Video/Telephone Proceeding Petition for Live Hearing in Courtroom (Rojas, Hector) Modified on 8/20/2021 to edit text. (cmd)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING re: #5 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge William M. Ray, II. If any party wishes for the hearing to occur live in the courtroom with all counsel present, they may petition the Court within ten (10) days of the date of this Notice of Hearing.You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (cmd)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ellsworth Groce.(Cole, Brenton) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 8/9/21. (rlb)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Set Aside Default with Brief In Support by Smith Transport PA, Inc.. (Included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith Transport PA, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/3/2022. (Filed 7/1/21 in Gwinnett County State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER from State Court of Gwinnett County: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff has and recover judgment against Defendant, Smith Transport PA, Inc. d/b/a Smith Transport Inc. in an amount to be determined at a bench or jury trial, as well as the costs of the filing of this action. (Filed 6/21/21 in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment against Smith Transport PA, Inc. d/b/a Smith Transport Inc. by Carl Parker. (Filed 6/18/21 in Gwinnett County State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ellsworth Groce. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11167592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 8/9/2021 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Smith Transport PA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Parker
Represented By: Hector J Rojas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Transport PA, Inc. doing business as Smith Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Mark Allen Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellsworth Groce
Represented By: Brenton Webster Cole
Represented By: Mark Allen Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?