Palazzo v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Francis Palazzo
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Berkeley Capital Partners LLC and Brad Raffensperger
Case Number: 1:2021cv03253
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER confirming the Award, based on parties Joint Stipulation. It is further ordered that all references to the Disclosure be expunged from Mr. Palazzos IARD, IAPD, CRD, and BrokerCheck records and that any other claims be DISMISSED with each party bearing its own costs. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/23/2021. (dob)
September 23, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION by Anthony Francis Palazzo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Todd, Thomas)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Brad Raffensperger Answer due 10/5/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/21/2021. (jpk)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Arbitration,, with Brief In Support by Brad Raffensperger. (Winkles, Logan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Petition for Arbitration by Berkeley Capital Partners LLC.(Zichterman, Patrick) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Anthony Francis Palazzo. Brad Raffensperger served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (Todd, Thomas)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Arbitration. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. Answer due 9/24/2021. Entered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/2/21. (hfm)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Petition for Arbitration,, by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittaker, Andrew)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Chelsea Morgan Bauer. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/23/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dob)
August 23, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Chelsea Morgan Bauer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11195191).. Attorney Chelsea Morgan Bauer added appearing on behalf of Anthony Francis Palazzo (nmb)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Chelsea Morgan Bauer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11195191).by Anthony Francis Palazzo. (Todd, Thomas) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Anthony Francis Palazzo. Berkeley Capital Partners LLC served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Todd, Thomas)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service - FINRA by Anthony Francis Palazzo. (Todd, Thomas)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (dob)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Anthony Francis Palazzo (Todd, Thomas)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Berkeley Capital Partners LLC. (eop)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.. (eop)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Anthony Francis Palazzo. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11174756) (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -1, #3 Exhibit -2, #4 Exhibit -3, #5 Exhibit -4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2021: #7 Proposed Incorrect Summons - Georgia Securities Commissioner) (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palazzo v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Francis Palazzo
Represented By: Thomas R. Todd, Jr.
Represented By: Chelsea Morgan Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: John Steven Parker
Represented By: Patrick Zichterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Logan B. Winkles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?