Sang v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Ian Sang
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Shineka Miller
Case Number: 1:2021cv03310
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
September 24, 2021 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (dob)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ian Sang (Cohen, Marshall)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Ian Sang. Ur M. Jaddou served on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021; Shineka Miller served on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jaddou - executed summons, #2 Summons Miller - executed summons, #3 Summons Garland - executed summons, #4 Summons Erskine - executed summons)(Cohen, Marshall)
August 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kurt R. Erskine. (eop)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland. (eop)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Miller. (eop)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou. (eop)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (eop)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall Lewis Cohen on behalf of Ian Sang (eop)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Ian Sang. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11183648) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Interview Notice, #2 Exhibit -B -USCIS online case status information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 8/13/2021 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sang v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Sang
Represented By: Marshall Lewis Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?