Patel v. The United States et al
Plaintiff: Raj Patel
Defendant: The United States, The President of the United States and The Honorable Joe R. Biden
Case Number: 1:2021cv03335
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to file by e-mail; denying as moot #5 Motion to receive e-notice; denying as moot #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #7 Motion to withdraw complaint dismissing this case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to Close this case. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/5/2021. (dob)
October 5, 2021 Submission of #5 MOTION to Receive E-Notice, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (dob)
October 5, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
October 5, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Raj Patel re #8 Order.(dob)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Complaint by Raj Patel. (jpa)
September 17, 2021 Submission of #4 MOTION for Leave to file by E-Mail, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- MOTION to Receive Electronic Notices by Raj Patel. (tmf) Modified on 9/16/2021 to add red text(tmf).
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Receive E-Notice by Raj Patel. (dob)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to file by E-Mail by Raj Patel. (jpa)
August 27, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Raj Patel re #3 Standing Order. (bgt)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (dgs) (ADI)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Raj Patel (jpa)
August 17, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (eop)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. The United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The President of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Honorable Joe R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?