Jones v. Pannell et al
Plaintiff: Deon D. Jones
Defendant: Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. and U. S. Marshal Grady
Case Number: 1:2021cv03379
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deon D. Jones re #5 Order Reassigning Case. (ceo)
August 26, 2021 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (ceo)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-03379-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 08/25/21. (ceo)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Judge Amy Totenberg for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-03379-AT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 8/23/2021. (tcc)
August 23, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deon D. Jones re #4 Order of Recusal. (tcc)
August 23, 2021 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (tcc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Deon D. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. [Doc. 1]. The undersigned defers to the District Judge any determination as to whether the filing is frivolous, including whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, and ought to be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), along with any instructions to the parties regarding service and case management. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/20/2021. (tcc)
August 20, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deon D. Jones re #2 Order ruling on IFP. (tcc)
August 20, 2021 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination, to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Deon D. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
August 19, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Pannell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Marshal Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?