Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. ISS Facility Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: ISS Facility Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03708
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Toni Read on behalf of ISS Facility Services, Inc. (Read, Toni)
October 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Shiver Snelling on behalf of ISS Facility Services, Inc. (Snelling, John)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. ISS Facility Services, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Rogusky, Veronica)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. ISS Facility Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Veronica Rogusky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISS Facility Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Shiver Snelling
Represented By: Toni Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?