Smith v. International Business Machines Corp.
Plaintiff: Tanya Smith
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03856
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Olena Savytska Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11316208).. Attorney Olena Savytska added appearing on behalf of Tanya Smith (nmb)
October 14, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Shannon Liss-Riordan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11316082).. Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan added appearing on behalf of Tanya Smith (nmb)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 #11 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/14/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Shannon Liss-Riordan. Clerk to follow-up by 10/18/2021. (nmb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Olena Savytska. Clerk to follow-up by 10/18/2021. (nmb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Olena Savytska Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11316208).by Tanya Smith. (Cleveland, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Shannon Liss-Riordan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11316082).by Tanya Smith. (Cleveland, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William Stanford Cleveland on behalf of Tanya Smith (Cleveland, William)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John Lawrence Mays terminated. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/4/21. (bnw)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney William S. Cleveland with Brief In Support by Tanya Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Consent, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mays, John)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/22/21. (bnw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corp.. (ayw)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION to Provisionally Seal Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 (Doc. 1-3 and Docs. 1-5 through 1-11), which were filed in support of Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award. The documents shall be sealed until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 09/22/2021. (ayw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tanya Smith. International Business Machines Corp. waiver mailed on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Mays, John)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Provisionally Seal Documents re: #1 Petition for Arbitration,,, by Tanya Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mays, John) Modified on 9/22/2021 (ayw). Modified on 9/22/2021 (ayw).
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Tanya Smith (Mays, John)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Vacate arbitration award filed by Tanya Smith. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11267046) (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit 1 EEOC Determination Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 Demand for Arbitration Form, #4 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Olena Savytska, #5 Exhibit 4 IBM's Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Arbitration, #6 Exhibit 5 Opposition to IBM's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 6 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit 7 Motion for Reconsideration, #9 Exhibit 8 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #10 Exhibit 9 Amended Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #11 Exhibit 10 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 9/22/2021 Exhibits 2, 4-10 sealed per #5 Order (ayw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. International Business Machines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Smith
Represented By: John Lawrence Mays
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Olena Savytska
Represented By: William Stanford Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?