Campus Life and Style v. Jordan
Plaintiff: Campus Life and Style
Defendant: Kristian Jordan
Case Number: 1:2021cv03866
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Remand Letter to the Clerk of Cobb County Magistrate Court re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (ceo)
October 18, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clerk of Cobb County Magistrate Court re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Remand Letter. (ceo)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING and ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation. For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, this action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/14/21. (bnw)
October 15, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Campus Life and Style, Kristian Jordan re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (bnw)
October 15, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (bnw)
October 7, 2021 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Kristian Jordan, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ayw)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 09/22/2021. (ayw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Kristian Jordan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 09/22/2021. c:Financial Office(ayw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Kristian Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis and, directing Jordan to pay either pay the standard filing fee of $402.00 or submit the affidavit within 7 days from entry date of this order. Failure to submit payment may result in dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 09/22/2021. c:Financial Office(ayw)
September 22, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kristian Jordan re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Order ruling on IFP,, Order Directing Payment of the Filing Fee, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ayw)
September 21, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction: Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas added to case in error. (eop)
September 21, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction: Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas is the Referral Judge in this case. (eop)
September 21, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kristian Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
September 20, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campus Life and Style v. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campus Life and Style
Represented By: Alain Didier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristian Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?