Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Pilot Freight Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Pilot Freight Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03936
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin S. Borozan Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: duplicate PHV. (nmb)
November 22, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin S. Borozam Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Kevin S. Borozan added appearing on behalf of Pilot Freight Services, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin S. Borozan Pro Hac Vice.by Pilot Freight Services, Inc.. (Snelling, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin S. Borozam Pro Hac Vice.by Pilot Freight Services, Inc.. (Snelling, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 19, 2021 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin S. Borozam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11401302). to attorney for correction re: Spelling of applicants last name. (cdg)
November 19, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen L. Sitley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11401251). Attorney Stephen L. Sitley added appearing on behalf of Pilot Freight Services, Inc. (cdg)
November 18, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary Ann Smigielski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11401160). Attorney Mary Ann Smigielski added appearing on behalf of Pilot Freight Services, Inc. (cdg)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin S. Borozam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11401302).by Pilot Freight Services, Inc.. (Snelling, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Stephen L. Sitley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11401251).by Pilot Freight Services, Inc.. (Snelling, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary Ann Smigielski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11401160).by Pilot Freight Services, Inc.. (Snelling, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Shiver Snelling on behalf of Pilot Freight Services, Inc. (Snelling, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Pilot Freight Services, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/29/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Mills, Adam)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Pilot Freight Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Adam T. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Freight Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin S. Borozan
Represented By: Mary Ann Smigielski
Represented By: Stephen L. Sitley
Represented By: John Shiver Snelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?