Harper v. Barbosa et al
Plaintiff: Charles Harper
Defendant: Tonitia Sunni Barbosa, GodlyGirl Entertainment, Jeff Bezos and Amazon
Case Number: 1:2021cv03951
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/17/2021. (dmb)
November 17, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Charles Harper re #5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (dmb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charles Harper. (rlh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (dmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2021: #1 Corrected PDF) (dmb).
October 8, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Charles Harper re #2 Order Reassigning Case,. (rlh)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-CV-3951-TCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/7/21. (rlh)
September 24, 2021 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
September 24, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Charles Harper re AO Form 121 - Notice to Parties. (Form AO 121 sent) (eop)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Charles Harper. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number GAN100133004) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Barbosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonitia Sunni Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GodlyGirl Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?