Hollis v. Henry et al
Plaintiff: Kendrianna Hollis
Defendant: Wayne A. Henry, Bebo Logistics, Inc., Progressive Express Insurance Company, John Doe and ABC Corp. 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv03999
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Transmittal of certified copies of #5 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court of Fulton County and docket sheet. (adg)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Remand to State Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/29/2021. (adg)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Parsons, Erica)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Plaintiff by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Parsons, Erica)
October 29, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (adg)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Bebo Logistics, Inc., Wayne A. Henry. Discovery ends on 3/28/2022.(Parsons, Erica) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 10/28/2021 to link to Doc. 1 (ayw). Modified on 10/29/2021 (adg).
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11290074) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -2 - State Court Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollis v. Henry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrianna Hollis
Represented By: Clark Richard Karell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne A. Henry
Represented By: Erica L. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bebo Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Erica L. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Hancock Sabulis
Represented By: Erica L. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?