YER USA, Inc. et al v. Magloire et al
Plaintiff: YER USA, Inc. and Camilla Daniels
Defendant: Yasheka Magloire, Renata Adjibodou, Didra Goodlow, Juanita Simmons, Marty Walsh and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv04001
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to attorney Karen Weinstock re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (bgt)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Karen Weinstock. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/24/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (bgt)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER for Preliminary Injunction. (Reeseman, Ariana) Modified on 11/24/2021 to edit text(jra).
November 22, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen Weinstock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11409387).. Attorney Karen Weinstock added appearing on behalf of Camilla Daniels, YER USA, Inc. (nmb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: PI/TRO Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2021 granting #3 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Motion Hearing. Counsel for Plaintiff was directed to submit a proposed order granting their motion that summarizes the findings of the Court. A written order will follow. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(anc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen Weinstock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11409387).by Camilla Daniels, YER USA, Inc.. (Reeseman, Ariana) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M. Beranek on behalf of Renata Adjibodou, Merrick Garland, Didra Goodlow, Yasheka Magloire, Juanita Simmons, Marty Walsh (Beranek, Lori)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDEmergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order filed by YER USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits Accompanying Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response to Motion)(Reeseman, Ariana)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing UNPUBLISHED OPINION by Renata Adjibodou, Merrick Garland, Didra Goodlow, Yasheka Magloire, Juanita Simmons, Marty Walsh re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDEmergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order (Beranek, Lori)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDEmergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order filed by Renata Adjibodou, Merrick Garland, Didra Goodlow, Yasheka Magloire, Juanita Simmons, Marty Walsh. (Beranek, Lori)
November 10, 2021 NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDEmergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order Motion Hearing reset for 11/19/2021 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDEmergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
October 15, 2021 Submission of #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTEDEmergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (ah)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order with Brief In Support by Camilla Daniels, YER USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law and Authorities, Statement of Facts, Compliance Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reeseman, Ariana)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Renata Adjibodou, Didra Goodlow, Yasheka Magloire, Juanita Simmons, Marty Walsh, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(ah)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Camilla Daniels and YER USA, Inc.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11290429) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YER USA, Inc. et al v. Magloire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YER USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ariana Lynne Reeseman
Represented By: Karen Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Daniels
Represented By: Ariana Lynne Reeseman
Represented By: Karen Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasheka Magloire
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renata Adjibodou
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Didra Goodlow
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Simmons
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Walsh
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?