Longo v. Johnson & Johnson
Plaintiff: William Longo
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv04020
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 New Civil Action Number in USDC NJ 3:21-cv-20040 (aar)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Transfer Case. Pursuant to Rule 45(f), the undersigned finds that there are exceptional circumstances in this case warranting a transfer of the motion to quash to the issuing court. The Clerk is therefore DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for disposition in connection with Case No. 3:18- CV-1833-FLW-TJB (D.N.J.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/16/2021. (cmd)
November 16, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated from case. (cmd)
November 16, 2021 Case transferred to District of New Jersey. (cmd)
October 26, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Kitchens, Madison)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby WITHDRAWS its #16 October 14, 2021 Order transferring the case to the District of New Jersey. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/14/2021. (jtj)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WITHDRAWN PER DKT. 17 ORDER ORDER granting #11 Motion to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey for disposition in connection with Case No. 3:18-cv-1833-FLW-TJB (D.N.J.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/14/21. (ceo) Modified on 10/14/2021 (bgt).
October 14, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated from case. (ceo)
October 14, 2021 Case electronically transferred to United States District Court for the District of New Jersey.(ceo) Modified on 10/14/2021 - Contacted Clerk's Office in the Northern District of New Jersey (Trenton) re 17 Order. They will not open the transferred case. (bgt).
October 12, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey, filed by William Longo. (jtj)
October 12, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Quash Foreign Subpoena Issued by Johnson & Johnson, filed by William Longo. (jtj)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Kristen R. Seeger. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/5/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(cmd)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Neil Harris Conrad. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/5/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(cmd)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jack Nowell Frost, Jr. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/5/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(cmd)
October 5, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jack Nowell Frost, Jr. re #13 Order on Application for Admission PHV, Neil Harris Conrad re #14 Order on Application for Admission PHV, and Kristen R. Seeger re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (cmd)
October 4, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristen R. Seeger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11286505). Attorney Kristen R. Seeger added appearing on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (cdg)
October 4, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack Nowell Frost, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11286464). Attorney Jack Nowell Frost, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (cdg)
October 4, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Neil Harris Conrad Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11286491). Attorney Neil H. Conrad added appearing on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (cdg)
September 28, 2021 Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:21-mi-00067-WMR-CCB. (adg)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Quash Foreign Subpoena Issued by Johnson & Johnson filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Kitchens, Madison)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of New Jersey with Brief In Support by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Kitchens, Madison)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Johnson & Johnson. (Kitchens, Madison)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristen R. Seeger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11286505).by Johnson & Johnson. (Kitchens, Madison) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Neil Harris Conrad Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11286491).by Johnson & Johnson. (Kitchens, Madison) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack Nowell Frost, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11286464).by Johnson & Johnson. (Kitchens, Madison) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Hunter Kitchens on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (Kitchens, Madison)
September 15, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jtj)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 Brief in Support of Motion to Quash by William Longo re #4 MOTION to Quash Foreign Subpoena Issued by Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ludwig, Eric) Modified on 9/21/2021 to correct docket text(adg).
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash Foreign Subpoena Issued by Johnson & Johnson with Brief In Support by William Longo. (Ludwig, Eric)
August 31, 2021 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (adg)
August 24, 2021 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (adg)
August 20, 2021 Remark re #3 Withdrawal of Motion. Filing Attorney has not appeared as counsel for plaintiff. (adg)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 Withdrawal of Motion #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by William Longo filed by William Longo. (Smith, David)
August 11, 2021 Refund in the amount of $49.00 has been processed, effective 8/11/2021 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
August 11, 2021 Clerks Approval re #2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11171181. (Burch, John)
August 10, 2021 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Foreign Subpoena issued by Johnson & Johnson, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Foreign Subpoena issued by Johnson & Johnson by William Longo. (eop)
August 9, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11171294 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longo v. Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Longo
Represented By: Charles McCall Medlin
Represented By: John V. Burch
Represented By: Eric Allen Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Madison Hunter Kitchens
Represented By: Jack Nowell Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Kristen R. Seeger
Represented By: Neil H. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?