Sargent et al v. Gray et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Sargent and Yolanda Sargent
Defendant: John Gray, Jr., Gray Transportation, LLC and Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04051
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties shall have eight (8) months for discovery. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/4/2021. (cmd)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Initial Disclosures by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Crowl, Gillian)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Crowl, Gillian)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 First Initial Disclosures by Jerome Sargent.(Odetunde, Adewale)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/5/2021. (cmd)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 3/3/2022.(Crowl, Gillian) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11296324) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Certificate of Filing, #3 Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sargent et al v. Gray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Sargent
Represented By: Adewale Odetunde, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Sargent
Represented By: Adewale Odetunde, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Gillian Shannon Crowl
Represented By: Mike O. Crawford, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?