Pepperdine v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Jason Pepperdine
Defendant: Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC and Cherokee Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04073
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(Wyrick, Jason)
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jason Pepperdine. (Rice, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 Initial Disclosures by Jason Pepperdine.(Rice, James)
November 11, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Jason Pepperdine.(Rice, James)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 5/2/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/04/2021. (jkb)
November 4, 2021 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Order. Defendants have not been properly served. Defendants have acknowledged service, however, effective the date of this Order. As such, Defendants shall have thirty (30) days to file an amended responsive pleading and shall have forty-five (45) days to respond to Plaintiff's written discovery. Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal is hereby withdrawn. It is further concluded that jurisdiction and venue are proper in this Court. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/03/2021. (jkb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 Reply to #6 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC re #6 Response (Non-Motion) (Wyrick, Jason) Modified on 11/4/2021 to edit text (jkb).
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Order by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wyrick, Jason)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Wyrick, Jason)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(Wyrick, Jason)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Jason Pepperdine. Dale Leon Perry served on 10/12/2021. (Rice, James)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 (Withdrawn per Order #12 )RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal,, in Opposition filed by Jason Pepperdine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service (Roane), #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of Service (Cherokee))(Rice, James) Modified on 11/4/2021 to edit text(jkb).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 5, 2021. (ash)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Oakland Financial Corporation for Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (vs)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cherokee Insurance Company.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Roane Transportation Services, LLC.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dale Leon Perry. Discovery ends on 2/28/2022.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11298780) filed by Cherokee Insurance Company, Dale Leon Perry, Roane Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 Request for Admissions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepperdine v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Pepperdine
Represented By: James A. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Leon Perry
Represented By: Gregory Carl Maddaleni
Represented By: Jason Guy Wyrick
Represented By: Joseph Robb Cruser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roane Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Carl Maddaleni
Represented By: Jason Guy Wyrick
Represented By: Joseph Robb Cruser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Carl Maddaleni
Represented By: Jason Guy Wyrick
Represented By: Joseph Robb Cruser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?