Moeller Purcell Construction Company, Inc. v. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Moeller Purcell Construction Company, Inc.
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04147
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE P's 1st ROGs and RFPs - COS by Moeller Purcell Construction Company, Inc..(Weinstein, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Moeller Purcell Construction Company, Inc..(Weinstein, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company Certificate of Service (Hunter, Hilary)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: The Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of this Court except as herein modified: per the Parties request, the Court assigns this case to a six (6)- month discovery track, to conclude on May 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/16/21. (ceo)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Moeller Purcell Construction Company, Inc.. (Weinstein, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.(Hunter, Hilary)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 1st ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 3/11/2022.(Hunter, Hilary) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
October 12, 2021 Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11311134) filed by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A GA Corp Division, #2 Exhibit B Entire Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 10/12/2021 to correct filed date (vs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moeller Purcell Construction Company, Inc. v. The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moeller Purcell Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent J. Kaplan
Represented By: Hilary Wayne Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?