Lang v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Lang
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04196
Filed: October 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Regarding Discovery by Sig Sauer, Inc..(Horowitz, Andrew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Local Rule 26.3 by Robert Lang.(Bonham, Matthew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures by Robert Lang.(Bonham, Matthew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Upon review of the information contained in the Joint Preliminary Planning Report, the court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as stated in the completed form [Doc. No. #9 ] except as herein modified. This case shall proceed on an 8-month discovery track. Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 11/10/2021. (tcc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Robert Lang. (Bonham, Matthew)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Sig Sauer, Inc..(Horowitz, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kristen Elizabeth Dennison.. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/26/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ayw)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Keith Gibson. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/26/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ayw)
October 25, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristen Elizabeth Dennison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11341632).. Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Dennison added appearing on behalf of Sig Sauer, Inc. (nmb)
October 25, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian Keith Gibson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11341627).. Attorney Brian Keith Gibson added appearing on behalf of Sig Sauer, Inc. (nmb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristen Elizabeth Dennison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11341632).by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(Horowitz, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian Keith Gibson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11341627).by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(Horowitz, Andrew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sig Sauer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sig Sauer US Holding LP, Corporate Parent L&O Finance GmbH, Other Affiliate Sig Sauer, Inc. for Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Horowitz, Andrew)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Sig Sauer, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/14/2022.(Horowitz, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11317537) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -S. Shawver Declaration, #2 Exhibit -B -Complaint, #3 Exhibit -C -Plaintiff's Summons, #4 Exhibit -D -Acknowledgment of Service, #5 Exhibit -E -Plaintiff's Demand, #6 Exhibit -F -Notice of Filing Notice of removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lang v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lang
Represented By: Matthew Preston Bonham
Represented By: Nick T. Protentis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Horowitz
Represented By: Brian Keith Gibson
Represented By: Stevan Anthony Miller
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Dennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?