Diaw v. Miller et al
Petitioner: Hamed Diaw
Respondent: Shineka Scott Miller, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv04327
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (abm)
November 29, 2021 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (abm)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Hamed Diaw (Chaney, Justin)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/1/2021. (cmd)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stephen Harris. (eop)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland. (eop)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (eop)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (eop)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Scott Miller. (eop)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Hamed Diaw. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11332365) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -USCIS Notice Interview N400, #2 Exhibit -B -USCIS Notice Interview Results, #3 Exhibit -C -USCIS Second Notice of Interview, #4 Exhibit -D -USCIS Decision, #5 Exhibit -E -N336 Filing Petitioner, #6 Exhibit -F -USCIS N336 Receipt, #7 Exhibit -G --USCIS Processing Times Void N336, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaw v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hamed Diaw
Represented By: Justin W. Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shineka Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?