AU Card, LLC v. Burton
Plaintiff: AU Card, LLC
Defendant: Megan Burton
Case Number: 1:2021cv04341
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 09
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AU Card, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PMA Media Group, Inc. for AU Card, LLC. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth)
December 8, 2021 Clerks Notation re #7 Leave of Absence by Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt on these dates. (jeh)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): December 27, 2021 through and including December 30, 2021, by Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AU Card, LLC. Megan Burton waiver mailed on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File. Exhibit B to the Declaration of Eileen Rumfelt shall be restricted on the ECF System. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/20/2021. (ah)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal(Exhibit B to Declaration of Eileen Rumfelt [Doc. 1-1]) with Brief In Support by AU Card, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rumfelt, Eileen Elizabeth)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Megan Burton. (eop)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by AU Card, LLC. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11334988) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Declaration -E. H. Rumfelt, #2 Exhibit -2 -Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AU Card, LLC v. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AU Card, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Collins Vey
Represented By: Eileen Elizabeth Hintz Rumfelt
Represented By: Ryan Altgeld Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?