Owners Insurance Company v. Luke Electric, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Luke Electric, Inc., SolAmerica Energy, LLC, Safari Energy, LLC, Terrell Solar I, LLC, Terrell Solar II, LLC, Walter R. Riles, William B. Stovall, Shannon Strickland and Jennifer Strickland
Case Number: 1:2021cv04393
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Safari Energy, LLC Answer due 12/30/2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/02/2021. (jkb)
December 1, 2021 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Safari Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Charles)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Luke Electric, Inc. Answer due 12/30/2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/29/2021. (jkb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Luke Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order Granting Motion)(Cobb, Mark)
November 23, 2021 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. William B. Stovall served on 11/14/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 23, 2021 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Walter R. Riles served on 11/14/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Safari Energy, LLC Answer due 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/19/2021. (dmb)
November 16, 2021 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Safari Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Charles)
November 11, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Allison Cobb on behalf of Luke Electric, Inc. (Cobb, Mark)
November 11, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hale Van Horn on behalf of Safari Energy, LLC (Van Horn, Charles)
November 9, 2021 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Shannon Strickland served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 9, 2021 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Jennifer Strickland served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 9, 2021 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Luke Electric, Inc. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 8, 2021 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. SolAmerica Energy, LLC served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Terrell Solar II, LLC served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Terrell Solar I, LLC served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Safari Energy, LLC served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Dietrichs, Mark)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Home-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Property-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Southern-Owners Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Home-Owners Life Insurance, Other Affiliate Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company by Owners Insurance Company.(Kahren, Melissa)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on October 26, 2021. (ash)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jennifer Strickland. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shannon Strickland. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to William B. Stovall. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Walter R. Riles. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Terrell Solar II, LLC. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Terrell Solar I, LLC. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Safari Energy, LLC. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to SolAmerica Energy, LLC. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Luke Electric, Inc.. (eop)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11344791) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Strickland Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B - SolAmerica's 3rd Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit -C -Cross-Claim of Safari, #4 Exhibit -D -SolAmerica Contract with Luke, #5 Exhibit -E - 8/19/20 Letter, #6 Exhibit -F - Luke Policy, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Luke Electric, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Thomas Dietrichs
Represented By: Melissa Kaye Kahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Allison Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolAmerica Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safari Energy, LLC
Represented By: Charles Hale Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell Solar I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell Solar II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R. Riles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?