Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc. v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc.
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04445
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc..(Allred, William)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure Statement by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Allred, William) Modified on 12/1/2021 to edit text (jra).
November 30, 2021 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER re #3 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/23/2021. Discovery ends on 3/8/2022. Summary Judgment Motions or Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2022. Clerk to submit 4/11/2022 if not filed. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/29/2021. (anc)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc.. (King, Russell)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Disclosures by Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc..(King, Russell)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc. and Associated Industries Ins. Co. Inc. (King, Russell) Modified on 11/24/2021 to edit text (jra).
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/28/2022. (Filed in Superior Court on 10/27/21 and included with Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11355042) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B - Order, #3 Exhibit -C -Answer, #4 Exhibit -D -Jury Demand, #5 Exhibti -E -Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc. v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dependable Construction and Roofing, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan P. Aldridge
Represented By: Russell Donald King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Howard
Represented By: William Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?