Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Hamilton et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Linda Hamilton and Rhashonda James
Case Number: 1:2021cv04458
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Linda Hamilton waiver mailed on 11/2/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (White, Brendan)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Rhashonda James waiver mailed on 11/2/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (White, Brendan)
November 18, 2021 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $11,592.74, Receipt #: GAN100134375. (anc)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $10,923.00, plus accrued interest, if any. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court accept MetLifes check and receive the funds at issue into the registry of this Court. Funds received pursuant to this Order meet the Internal Revenue Service definition of a Disputed Ownership Fund (DOF) and must be deposited into the CRIS DOF administered by the Administrative Office of the United States Courts, which will be responsible for meeting all DOF tax requirements. The ultimate disposition of these funds will be determined by Order of this Court in the above-styled action. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 11/1/2021. (rjc)
November 1, 2021 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Brendan)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (White, Brendan)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11356822) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 10/28/2021 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Hamilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron Edward Pohlmann
Represented By: Brendan Hanner White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhashonda James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?