Leedom v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Debra Leedom
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv04463
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Debra Leedom. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/8/2021, answer due 2/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Piemonte, George)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(tcc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Debra Leedom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP. [Doc. #1 ]. This action shall therefore proceed as any other civil action. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED TO FORWARD sufficient USM 285 Forms to Plaintiff's counsel. Upon receipt, Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the forms and return them to the Clerk within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this Order, so that process may be served upon Defendant. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service service packages for Defendant. Upon receipt of the service packages, the U.S. Marshal's Service is DIRECTED to serve Defendant. The completed USM 285 forms shall be filed with the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/29/2021. (tcc)
October 29, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George C. Piemonte re #2 Order, Forms sent to party: USM 285. (tcc)
October 29, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (jpa)
October 28, 2021 CLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-cv-4463-AJB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jpa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Debra Leedom. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons -3)(eop)
October 28, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
October 28, 2021 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Debra Leedom. (Piemonte, George)
October 28, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (aar)
October 28, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (aar)
October 28, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction Case referred to Magistrate Judge Walker in error, Case should be referred to Magistrate Judge Baverman (aar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leedom v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Leedom
Represented By: George C Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?