Carney, M.D., PHARMD v. Emory University
Plaintiff: K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD
Defendant: Emory University
Case Number: 1:2021cv04531
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
2 Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting the #16 Report and Recommendation and denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/30/2021. (anc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time respond to motion to dismiss with Brief In Support by K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD. (Bunch, Gary)
December 29, 2021 Filing 19 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Dec 29, 2021 - Jan 14, 2022 by Gary P. Bunch. (Bunch, Gary) Modified on 12/30/2021 to edit text(jra).
December 29, 2021 Submission of #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Emory University, #9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (jeh)
December 23, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Emory University. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(Read, Toni)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Service of #16 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/10/2021. (anc)
December 10, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the #9 MOTION to Dismiss be denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/10/2021. (anc)
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Emory Universitywith Jury Demand filed by K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD.(Bunch, Gary) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION to Stay Deadline for Parties' Initial Disclosures and Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan filed by K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD. (Bunch, Gary)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, the deadlines for the parties to file their Initial Disclosures and Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan are hereby stayed until the Court rules on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on December 8, 2021. (LTW)
December 7, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD. (Bunch, Gary) Modified to correct event on 12/7/2021 (ceo).
December 2, 2021 Clerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Deadline for Parties' Initial Disclosures and Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan with Brief In Support by Emory University. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Read, Toni)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons by K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD. (Bunch, Gary)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Emory University. (Read, Toni)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Emory University. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Read, Toni)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Jan. 31- Feb. 8, 2022, by Gary P. Bunch. (Bunch, Gary)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Dec. 13-24, 2021, by Gary P. Bunch. (Bunch, Gary)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): Dec. 13-24, 2021, by Gary P. Bunch. (Bunch, Gary)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD. Emory University served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Bunch, Gary)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Toni Read on behalf of Emory University (Read, Toni)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Shiver Snelling on behalf of Emory University (Snelling, John)
November 4, 2021 Notification of Docket Correction: Case assigned to Judge Grimberg in error case should be assigned to Judge Thrash as related to 1:21-cv-2802 (aar)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Emory University. (eop)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11368879) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carney, M.D., PHARMD v. Emory University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Jeff Carney, M.D., PHARMD
Represented By: Gary P. Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emory University
Represented By: Toni Read
Represented By: John Shiver Snelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?