Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Fowler et al
Petitioner: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Respondent: James Fowler and Robert Parish
Case Number: 1:2021cv04534
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Valz, Frederick) Modified on 12/28/2021 to edit text (jra).
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company for Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Valz, Frederick)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant Robert Parish's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment by Robert Parish. Discovery ends on 5/9/2022.(Connolly, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. James Fowler served on 11/27/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Valz, Frederick)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Robert Parish served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Valz, Frederick)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert Parish. (eop)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to James Fowler. (eop)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11369991) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Parish Policy, #2 Exhibit -B -Underlying Lawsuit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Fowler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Frederick Mills Valz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Parish
Represented By: John F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?