Booker et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jennelle Booker and Anthony Booker
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04606
Filed: November 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrika Monique Crutchfield on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Crutchfield, Terrika)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. William Maxwell Compton for Anthony Booker and William Maxwell Compton for Jennelle Booker replacing attorney Howard William Weber. (Filed in State Court on 9/25/21 and included with Notice of Removal) (eop)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing, Discovery by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (eop) Modified -Date Filed on 11/9/2021 (eop).
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Discovery ends on 4/4/2022.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11377614) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Certificate, #3 Declaration - Melissa Segel, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booker et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennelle Booker
Represented By: Howard William Weber
Represented By: William Maxwell Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Booker
Represented By: Howard William Weber
Represented By: William Maxwell Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Melissa A. Segel
Represented By: Terrika Monique Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?