Nguyen v. Huynh et al
Plaintiff: Hong M Nguyen
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Agent Holley Huynh and Farmers Insurance
Case Number: 1:2021cv04638
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action without prejudice. (cmd)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 17, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Hong M Nguyen re #6 Clerk's Judgment, #5 Order to Dismiss. (cmd)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and finds that it must be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court notes for Plaintiff's benefit that dismissal is without prejudice. This means that Plaintiff may refile his claims and seek to cure the jurisdictional defect identified in this Order. Alternatively, Plaintiff may choose to file his claims in state court. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/16/2021. (cmd)
November 16, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (cmd)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Farmers Insurance, Agent Holley Huynh filed by Hong M Nguyen.(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Hong M Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk is directed to submit this action to the District Court for a frivolity determination of Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/15/2021. (cmd)
November 15, 2021 Submission of #4 Amended Complaint, #3 Complaint, to District Judge Leigh Martin May for frivolity determination. (cmd)
November 15, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Hong M Nguyen re #2 Order ruling on IFP. (cmd)
November 10, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (jra)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hong Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Huynh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong M Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Agent Holley Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?