Whitlock v. Community Solutions INC et al
Plaintiff: Duane Whitlock
Defendant: Community Solutions INC, Fernando Muniz, Tysha Phillips, Ashley Chatman and Segrid Lewis
Case Number: 1:2021cv04709
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Submission for Frivolity re: #4 Complaint, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (vs)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Duane Whitlock against Community Solutions, Inc., Ashley Chatman, Tysha Phillips, Segrid Lewis.(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/16/2021 to add parties to text(vs).
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Duane Whitlock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. But for the undersigned to conduct a full frivolity review to determine whether Plaintiff's case may proceed, he is ORDERED to file an amended complaint in accordance with the above-mentioned instructions no later than Thursday, December 16, 2021. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit the case to the undersigned on December 17, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III on 11/24/2021. (cmd)
November 24, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Duane Whitlock re #2 Order ruling on IFP. (cmd)
November 16, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (abm)
November 15, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Duane Whitlock. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitlock v. Community Solutions INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Solutions INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tysha Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segrid Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?