Anderson et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Joseph T. Anderson and Karen Anderson
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv04923
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' #4 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court grants the parties' request for an eight month discovery period, to concluded on September 2, 2022. As this is twice the time anticipated by the Local Rules for discovery in litigation of this nature, no further extension of discovery will be permitted under any circumstances. Any motions for summary judgment or the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed on or before October 2, 2022. If a motion for summary judgment is filed, the proposed consolidated pretrial order must be filed within 30 days after this Court's ruling thereon. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/28/2022. (ddm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Allstate Indemnity Company.(McMullen, Melissa)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Disclosures by Allstate Indemnity Company.(McMullen, Melissa)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories, Requests to Produce, and Requests to Admit by Joseph T. Anderson, Karen Anderson.(Boohaker, David)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation (ALL) for Allstate Indemnity Company. (McMullen, Melissa)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (McMullen, Melissa)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Indemnity Company. (eop)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Allstate Indemnity Company. Discovery ends on 5/2/2022. (Filed 12/1/21 in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11430364) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -June 30, 2021 Letter to Allstate from Plaintiffs' Counsel, #2 Exhibit -B -Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit -C - Answer, #4 Verification - Melissa McMullen, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph T. Anderson
Represented By: David Louis Boohaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Anderson
Represented By: David Louis Boohaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Marvin Dewayne Dikeman
Represented By: Melissa Cordell McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?