Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Vods Atlanta LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Vods Atlanta LLC doing business as Up Restaurant and Lounge doing business as Vods Lounge & Bistro ATL and Kenya Lawrence
Case Number: 1:2021cv04924
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Portion of the PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Reemsnyder, Ronald) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit text (jpa).
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Kenya Lawrence. Discovery ends on 5/26/2022.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Vods Atlanta LLC served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
December 14, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Kenya Lawrence served on 12/11/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
December 13, 2021 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC.(lwb)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/3/21. (jpa)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenya Lawrence, Vods Atlanta LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Vods)(jra)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11430689) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Vods Atlanta LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vods Atlanta LLC doing business as Up Restaurant and Lounge doing business as Vods Lounge & Bistro ATL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenya Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?