Murphy v. McDonough et al
Plaintiff: Shar Issa Murphy
Defendant: Denis McDonough, Department of Veterans Affairs Agency and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2021cv04933
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING the #2 Report and Recommendation as the opinion and order of this Court and DENIES the #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Given that Plaintiff has now paid the filing fee, the Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit this case to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/29/21. (jpa)
December 29, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shar Issa Murphy re #4 Order (jpa)
December 29, 2021 Submission of #4 Order, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jpa)
December 28, 2021 Submission of #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa)
December 22, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 402.00, receipt number GAN100135057. (dob)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Service of #2 Report and Recommendation,, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/10/2021. (dob)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shar Issa Murphy be denied. If the District Court adopts this recommendation, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff be advised that she must pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days of the District Courts Order denying the Application. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this action may be dismissed for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/10/2021. (dob)
December 10, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shar Issa Murphy re #3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shar Issa Murphy. (dob)
December 2, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Shar Issa Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Reconsideration)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. McDonough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shar Issa Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?