Clark v. Diamond Diaspora Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Clark
Defendant: Diamond Diaspora Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05193
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jkb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Carson, Dorsey)
January 6, 2022 Submission of AO Form 121 - Notice to Parties, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (ash)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on December 23, 2021. (ash)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Diamond Diaspora Media, Inc.. (eop)
December 21, 2021 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dennis Clark. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11471014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-A -Photo, #2 Exhibit-B -Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit-C -Infringing Article, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 12/21/2021 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Diamond Diaspora Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Clark
Represented By: Dorsey R. Carson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Diaspora Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?