Gill v. AGK Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Manjit Singh Gill and Manjit Singh
Defendant: AGK Enterprises, Inc. and Kuljinder Singh
Case Number: 1:2021cv05200
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: J Clay Fuller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/3/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
December 30, 2021 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of John Joseph Jacko, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11479606).. Attorney John J. Jacko, III added appearing on behalf of Manjit Singh Gill (nmb)
December 28, 2021 Submission of #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (clk)
December 24, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of John Joseph Jacko, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11479606). with Brief In Support by Manjit Singh Gill. (Bushnell, Vincent) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 24, 2021 Filing 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena filed by Manjit Singh Gill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit November 29 Email - 1, #2 Exhibit November 29 Email - 2, #3 Exhibit November 29 Email - 3, #4 Exhibit November 29 Email - 4, #5 Exhibit November 23 Email - 1, #6 Exhibit November 23 Email - 2, #7 Exhibit November 23 Email - 3)(Bushnell, Vincent)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to John J. Jacko, III. Clerk to follow-up by 1/3/2022. (cdg)
December 16, 2021 Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:21-mi-00098-JPB-JCF. (adg)
December 16, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena filed by AGK Enterprises, Inc., Kuljinder Singh. (Pritchett, Steven)
December 2, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to AGK Enterprises, Inc., Kuljinder Singh re #2 Order. (adg)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING AGK and Kuljinder Singh to file their response(s) to Plaintiff's #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena no later than 14 days from the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff may file a reply no later than 14 days after service of the response(s). The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to AGK Enterprises, Inc. and to Kuljinder Singh at the address provided by the Georgia Secretary of State's website and on the Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's motion, i.e., 2790 Candler Road, Decatur, Georgia 30033. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 12/1/2021. (adg)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas by Manjit Singh Gill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Jacko Declaration, #2 Exhibit - Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
November 29, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number BGANDC-11423735 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. AGK Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manjit Singh Gill
Represented By: John J. Jacko, III
Represented By: Vincent C. Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manjit Singh
Represented By: John J. Jacko, III
Represented By: Vincent C. Bushnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGK Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuljinder Singh
Represented By: Steven J. Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?