Watkins v. Moody et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Watkins
Defendant: Freeman Moody, Latoya Carr, Sandra Parker, Natasha Freeman, Shakime Ferrer, Daniel Gassett, Austin Albino, Jessie Johnston, Cody Fountain, Keith Brown, Jeffrey Maben, Teneka Hurt, Loretta Lynch, Marco Killingsworth and Crystal Dismuke
Case Number: 1:2021cv05260
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay all the deadlines in this action until such time as the motion to consolidate is ruled upon, at which time the parties will report to this Court for direction. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/15/22. (jpa)
February 15, 2022 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Stay by Barbara Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Joint Motion to Stay)(Hewitt, Melvin)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING the parties Stipulation and #32 Consent Motion to Dismiss. Crystal Dismuke, Shakime Ferrer, Cody Fountain, Natasha Freeman, Daniel Gassett, Teneka Hurt, Jessie Johnston, Marco Killingsworth, Loretta Lynch, Jeffrey Maben, Sandra Parker, Austin Albino, and Keith Brown are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/15/22. (jpa)
February 14, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Fewer Than All Defendants by Barbara Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hewitt, Melvin)
February 14, 2022 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Natasha Freeman.(Woodward, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 11, 2022 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Natasha Freeman. Natasha Freeman waiver mailed on 2/10/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
February 9, 2022 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service, Latoya Carr by Barbara Watkins. (Hewitt, Melvin)
February 9, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Austin Albino, Keith Brown, Latoya Carr, Crystal Dismuke, Daniel Gassett, Teneka Hurt, Jessie Johnston, Marco Killingsworth, Loretta Lynch, Jeffrey Maben, Freeman Moody, Sandra Parker. Discovery ends on 7/11/2022.(Woodward, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 9, 2022 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marco Killingsworth. Marco Killingsworth waiver mailed on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keith Brown. Keith Brown waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Crystal Dismuke. Crystal Dismuke waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Gassett. Daniel Gassett waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Teneka Hurt. Teneka Hurt waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessie Johnston. Jessie Johnston waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Loretta Lynch. Loretta Lynch waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Maben. Jeffrey Maben waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Freeman Moody. Freeman Moody waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra Parker. Sandra Parker waiver mailed on 12/29/2021, answer due 2/28/2022. (Woodward, Karen)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/6/22. (jpa)
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Crystal Dismuke. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Summons Issued as to Marco Killingsworth. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to Loretta Lynch. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Teneka Hurt. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Maben. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Keith Brown. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cody Fountain. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jessie Johnston. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Austin Albino. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Daniel Gassett. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shakime Ferrer. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Natasha Freeman. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sandra Parker. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Latoya Carr. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Freeman Moody. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Barbara Watkins. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11478784) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Moody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Watkins
Represented By: Hilary Wayne Hunter
Represented By: Mark Byron Bullman
Represented By: Melvin Leroy Hewitt, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Crowson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Moody
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Carr
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Parker
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Freeman
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shakime Ferrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gassett
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Albino
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Johnston
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Brown
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Maben
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teneka Hurt
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Killingsworth
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Dismuke
Represented By: Marisa M. Beller
Represented By: William Thomas Craig
Represented By: Karen Eleice Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?