Georgia College of Emergency Physicians et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Georgia College of Emergency Physicians and Brett Cannon
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Labor, Department of the Treasury, Office of Personnel Management, Xavier Becerra, Janet Yellen, Martin J. Walsh and Kiran Ahuja
Amicus Curiae: Emergency Department Practice Management Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv05267
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Clerks Notation re #19 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Order Granting #20 Application for Admission of Jack R. Bierig Pro Hac Vice by CRD. at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on February 11, 2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (lme)
February 10, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack R. Bierig Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11570321).. Attorney Jack R. Bierig added appearing on behalf of Emergency Department Practice Management Association (nmb)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING the #18 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/7/22. (jpa)
February 4, 2022 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Jack R. Bierig Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11570321).by Emergency Department Practice Management Association. (Brennan, Robert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 4, 2022 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Emergency Department Practice Management Association. (Brennan, Robert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief AMICUS CURIAE in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Or In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment by Emergency Department Practice Management Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Brennan, Robert)
January 31, 2022 Notification of Docket Correction re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment. Pleading filed as single part motion; should be multi part motion. Clerk made necessary changes. (dob)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cone, Brittany) . Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 1/31/2022 (dob).
January 20, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Wolfson Young on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Xavier Becerra, Department of Labor, Department of the Treasury, Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Martin J. Walsh, Janet Yellen (Young, Danielle)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment Exceeding the Twenty-Five Page Limit is GRANTED. In addition, Defendants are hereby permitted an extension of twenty-five (25) pages beyond the limitation set forth under LR 7.1(D), NDGa. Defendants are also hereby permitted an extension to file their Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment to thirty-five (35) days after the date of service of Plaintiffs' motion. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/20/2022. (tmf)
January 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cone, Brittany)
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Trishanda L. Treadwell on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Xavier Becerra, Department of Labor, Department of the Treasury, Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Martin J. Walsh, Janet Yellen (Treadwell, Trishanda) Modified on 1/19/2022 QC email sent re Attorney Young filing(tmf).
January 12, 2022 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by Judge Mark H. Cohen. (smj)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. Department of the Treasury served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Civil Process Clerk)(Cone, Brittany)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. Janet Yellen served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Attorney General)(Cone, Brittany)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. Xavier Becerra served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Cone, Brittany)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. Martin J. Walsh served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Cone, Brittany)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. Kiran Ahuja served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Cone, Brittany)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. Office of Personnel Management served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Cone, Brittany)
January 10, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. Department of Labor served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Cone, Brittany)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon US Attorney's Office)(Cone, Brittany)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/3/2022. (tmf)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kiran Ahuja, Xavier Becerra, Department of Labor, Department of the Treasury, Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Martin J. Walsh, Janet Yellen, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons M. Walsh, #2 Summons J. Yellen, #3 Summons K. Ahuja, #4 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #5 Summons Department of Labor, #6 Summons Department of the Treasury, #7 Summons OPM, #8 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office-NDGA, #9 Summons Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office-D.C., #10 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. (cmd)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Brett Cannon, Georgia College of Emergency Physicians. (Filing fee $402, receipt number BGANDC-11479138) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgia College of Emergency Physicians et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia College of Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Baylee Alyse Culverhouse
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: Jordan Johnson
Represented By: Samuel David McLean, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Cannon
Represented By: Baylee Alyse Culverhouse
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: Jordan Johnson
Represented By: Samuel David McLean, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Yellen
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: Danielle Wolfson Young
Represented By: Trishanda L. Treadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Emergency Department Practice Management Association
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Represented By: Robert M. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?