Saint Fleur et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Mackenson Saint Fleur and Remonne Joseph-Saint Fleur
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Shineka Scott Miller
Case Number: 1:2021cv05268
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (ceo)
February 2, 2022 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ceo)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Remonne Joseph-Saint Fleur, Mackenson Saint Fleur (Lefkoff, Steven)
February 1, 2022 Clerks Denial re #10 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-11512308. (Lefkoff, Steven)
January 19, 2022 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of James O Hacking Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11512308). to attorney for correction re: Incorrect Local Counsel Bar Number. (nmb)
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of James O Hacking Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11512308).by Remonne Joseph-Saint Fleur, Mackenson Saint Fleur. (Lefkoff, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
December 28, 2021 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Remonne Joseph-Saint Fleur and Mackenson Saint Fleur. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney Kurt R. Erskine (vs)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Attorney General Merrick Garland (vs)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Scott Miller. (vs)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (vs)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (vs)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Remonne Joseph-Saint Fleur, Mackenson Saint Fleur. (vs)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11479423) filed by Mackenson Saint Fleur, Remonne Joseph-Saint Fleur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint Fleur et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mackenson Saint Fleur
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Represented By: Steven Miles Lefkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remonne Joseph-Saint Fleur
Represented By: James O. Hacking, III
Represented By: Steven Miles Lefkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?