Barahona v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Reina Victoria Barahona
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Shineka Miller
Case Number: 1:2021cv05269
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Reina Victoria Barahona. Ur M. Jaddou served on 1/7/2022, answer due 3/8/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 1/7/2022, answer due 3/8/2022; Shineka Miller served on 1/7/2022, answer due 3/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jaddou - executed summons, #2 Summons Miller - executed summons, #3 Summons Garland - executed summons, #4 Summons Erskine - executed summons)(Cohen, Marshall)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(tcc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Miller. (tcc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou.(tcc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (tcc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall Lewis Cohen on behalf of Reina Victoria Barahona. (tcc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Reina Victoria Barahona. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11479427) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barahona v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reina Victoria Barahona
Represented By: Marshall Lewis Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?