Auto Club Insurance Association v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Auto Club Insurance Association
Defendant: Constance Robinson, Donovan Wills, Sabrina Folds-Wills and Alvin E. Melson
Case Number: 1:2021cv05302
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 13 INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 02/15/2022. (jkb)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgement by Sabrina Folds-Wills. Discovery ends on 7/14/2022.(Collins, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 28, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Auto Club Insurance Association. Alvin E. Melson served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Sheridan, Kimberly)
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Auto Club Insurance Association. Sabrina Folds-Wills served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (Sheridan, Kimberly)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alvin E. Melson. (dmb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sabrina Folds-Wills. (dmb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Constance Robinson. (dmb)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Auto Club Insurance Association (Attachments: #1 Summons Folds-Wills Amended Summons, #2 Summons Melson Amended Summons)(Sheridan, Kimberly)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Sabrina Folds-Wills, Alvin E. Melson, Constance Robinson filed by Auto Club Insurance Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sheridan, Kimberly) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto Club Insurance Association.(Sheridan, Kimberly)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Auto Club Insurance Association. Alvin E. Melson served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Sheridan, Kimberly)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sabrina Folds-Wills, Alvin E. Melson, Constance Robinson, Donovan Wills. (Attachments: #1 Summons D. Wills, #2 Summons S. Folds-Wills, #3 Summons Melson)(ceo)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Auto Club Insurance Association. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11483214) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto Club Insurance Association v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto Club Insurance Association
Represented By: Kimberly Council Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donovan Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Folds-Wills
Represented By: William J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin E. Melson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?