Mallard IP LLC v. Mercury Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mallard IP LLC
Defendant: Mercury Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05316
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 17 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jkb)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. This closure is not a dismissal and does not preclude the filing of documents. The case may be re-opened if necessary. The parties are ORDERED to file documents to dispose of the case within 60 days of the date of this Order. Absent an extension of that deadline or further order of the Court, if no request to reopen the case is made within 60 days, the case will be considered DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE at that time. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 02/16/2022. (jkb)
February 16, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (jkb)
February 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE Of Filing by Mallard IP LLC re #13 Order, Plaintiff's Statement on Consolidation (Alexander, Cortney)
February 15, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Mallard IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Cortney)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Within 7 days of this Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide its position on whether these actions should be consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). Defendant Mercury Systems, Inc. may also state its position on consolidation by that deadline. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to request the entry of default against Defendant Trenton Systems, Inc., if appropriate, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 02/11/2022. (jkb)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #9 Order (Boyd, Brian)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #9 Order (Kodish, Thad)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #9 Order (Alexander, Cortney)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 31, 2022. (ash)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mercury Systems, Inc.'s answer shall be due 2/24/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 21, 2022. (ash)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick Boyd on behalf of Mercury Systems, Inc. (Boyd, Brian)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mercury Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kodish, Thad)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Mallard IP LLC. Mercury Systems, Inc. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Alexander, Cortney)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to the Director of the USPTO. (adg)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mercury Systems, Inc.. (adg)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallard IP LLC. (adg)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mallard IP LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11485214) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,603,330, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart for the '330 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallard IP LLC v. Mercury Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallard IP LLC
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Boyd
Represented By: Thad Charles Kodish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?