Mallard IP LLC v. Trenton Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mallard IP LLC
Defendant: Trenton Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05322
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trenton Systems, Inc.'s answer is due 3/21/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on February 15, 2022. (ash)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Warenzak on behalf of Trenton Systems, Inc. (Warenzak, Matthew)
February 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing by Mallard IP LLC re #8 Order, Plaintiff's Statement on Consolidation (Alexander, Cortney)
February 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Long, III on behalf of Trenton Systems, Inc. (Long, William)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mallard IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alexander, Cortney)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Within 7 days of this Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide its position on whether these actions should be consolidated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). Defendant Mercury Systems, Inc. may also state its position on consolidation by that deadline. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to request the entry of default against Defendant Trenton Systems, Inc., if appropriate, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 02/11/2022. (jkb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #6 Order (Alexander, Cortney)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 31, 2022. (ash)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Mallard IP LLC. Trenton Systems, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. (Alexander, Cortney)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Trenton Systems, Inc.. (jra)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jra)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Mallard IP LLC. (jra)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mallard IP LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11485474) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallard IP LLC v. Trenton Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallard IP LLC
Represented By: Cortney Scott Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trenton Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Warenzak
Represented By: William F. Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?