Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc. et al v. Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc. doing business as CEI doing business as Custom Ecology and Great American Alliance Insurance Company
Defendant: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05329
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Filing 30 PLAINTIFFS STAFFORD TRANSPORT OF MICHIGAN, INC. AND GREAT AMERICAN ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANYS ANSWER to #24 Counterclaim by DEFENDANT CRUM & FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by Great American Alliance Insurance Company, Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc..(Chandler, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 21, 2022 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company.(Levy, Joshua)
February 21, 2022 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc.s Initial Disclosures by Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc..(Chandler, James)
February 21, 2022 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff Great American Alliance Insurance Companys Initial Disclosures by Great American Alliance Insurance Company.(Chandler, James)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1B for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the request of Petitioner James P. Ruggeri to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/7/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1B for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the request of Petitioner Myles D. Morrison to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/7/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
February 7, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Myles D. Morrison re #25 Order on Application for Admission PHV,,. (tmf)
February 4, 2022 Submission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, or Alternatively, to Dismiss Count I for Declaratory Judgment and Further Relief to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
February 3, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 , #14 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Discovery ends on 7/5/2022.), ANSWER to #1 , #14 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Great American Alliance Insurance Company, Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc. by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Alphonsie) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #17 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Before the Court is the parties' Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan (Dkt. #15 ) (the Plan). Having considered the Plan, it is hereby APPROVED. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. This case is assigned to a four-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before July 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/3/2022. (tmf)
February 3, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Ruggeri Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney James P. Ruggeri added appearing on behalf of Great American Alliance Insurance Company (gas)
February 3, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Myles D. Morrison Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Myles D. Morrison added appearing on behalf of Great American Alliance Insurance Company (gas)
January 31, 2022 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Ruggeri Pro Hac Vice.by Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Chandler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 31, 2022 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Myles D. Morrison Pro Hac Vice.by Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Chandler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 31, 2022 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order re: #17 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. (Chandler, James)
January 31, 2022 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Myles D. Morrison Pro Hac Vice.by Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local Counsel Consent, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(Chandler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 31, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Ruggeri Pro Hac Vice.by Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Local Counsel Consent, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Admission)(Chandler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 31, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Great American Alliance Insurance Company, Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc.. (Chandler, James)
January 31, 2022 RETURN of #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Myles D. Morrison Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re:form. (gas)
January 31, 2022 RETURN of #18 APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Ruggeri Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: form. (gas)
January 20, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, or Alternatively, to Dismiss Count I for Declaratory Judgment and Further Relief filed by Great American Alliance Insurance Company, Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint, #2 Brief Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chandler, James)
January 20, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Alliance Insurance Company, Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company for Great American Alliance Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Stafford Logistics, Inc., Corporate Parent CEI SLI Acquisition, LLC, Corporate Parent Custom Ecology Holdco, LLC for Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc.. (Chandler, James)
January 20, 2022 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Companywith Jury Demand filed by Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc., Great American Alliance Insurance Company.(Chandler, James) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1B for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the request of Petitioner Joshua A. Levy to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/19/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It appearing to the Court that the requirements stated in LR 83.1B for admission pro hac vice have been satisfied, the request of Petitioner Kristin V. Gallagher to appear pro hac vice in the United States District Court, Northern District of Georgia in the subject case is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/19/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
January 19, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joshua A. Levy re #13 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (tmf)
January 18, 2022 RETURN of #8 APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Ruggeri Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511777). to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (gas)
January 18, 2022 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Myles D. Morrison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511794). to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (gas)
January 18, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua A. Levy Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Joshua A. Levy added appearing on behalf of Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (gas)
January 18, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristin V. Gallagher Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher added appearing on behalf of Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (gas)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua A. Levy Pro Hac Vice.by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Alphonsie) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 12, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristin V. Gallagher Pro Hac Vice.by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Alphonsie) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 12, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Myles D. Morrison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511794).by Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Chandler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of James P. Ruggeri Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11511777).by Great American Alliance Insurance Company. (Chandler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 10, 2022 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua A. Levy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11494847). to attorney for correction re: local counsel address. (gas)
January 10, 2022 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristin V. Gallagher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11494823). to attorney for correction re: local counsel address. (gas)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, or Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss Count I for Declaratory Judgment and Further Relief with Brief In Support by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Nelson, Alphonsie). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 2/4/2022 (jpk). Modified on 2/4/2022 to edit text (jpk).
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua A. Levy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11494847).by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Alphonsie) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kristin V. Gallagher Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11494823).by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Alphonsie) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc. for Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Nelson, Alphonsie)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Nelson, Alphonsie)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11486446) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -2 -Brock Claim Documents, #3 Ex-3 -2021.08.1 Policy, #4 Ex -4 -Letters, #5 Ex -5 -State Corporate Filings)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc. et al v. Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc. doing business as CEI doing business as Custom Ecology
Represented By: James Hunter Chandler
Represented By: James P. Ruggeri
Represented By: Myles D. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Alliance Insurance Company
Represented By: James Hunter Chandler
Represented By: James P. Ruggeri
Represented By: Myles D. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alphonsie Nelson
Represented By: Kristin V. Gallagher
Represented By: Joshua A. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stafford Transport of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: James Hunter Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?