Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc. et al v. Raffensperger
Plaintiff: Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Eric T. Woods, Katie Bailey Glenn, Phil Brown, Janice Stewart, Fair Districts GA and Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Case Number: 1:2021cv05337
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 52 U.S.C. ยง 10301 Denial or abridgement of right to vote on account of race or color
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 125 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Brad Raffensperger. Discovery ends on 7/25/2022.(Tyson, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 24, 2022 Filing 124 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority #123 filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 2/25/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 22, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods of Supplemental Authority in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Order in Baltimore Cty Branch of NAACP et al v Baltimore County et al)(Garabadu, Rahul)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #103 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ruth M. Greenwood. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/22/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 22, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #104 APPLICATION for Admission of Theresa J. Lee Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Theresa J. Lee added appearing on behalf of Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA (gas)
February 22, 2022 RETURN of #105 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel J. Hessel Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: specify admitted courts. (gas)
February 22, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #103 APPLICATION for Admission of Ruth M. Greenwood Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Ruth M. Greenwood added appearing on behalf of Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA (gas)
February 18, 2022 Filing 121 Proposed Findings of Fact by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
February 18, 2022 Filing 120 Proposed Findings of Fact by Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE by Brad Raffensperger of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in Arkansas State Conf. of the NAACP v. Arkansas Board of Apportionment)(Tyson, Bryan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT of Rahul Garabadu by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A52 - Corrected Appendix A to Report of Dr. Handley, #2 Exhibit A53 - Affidavit of Lisa Handley)(Garabadu, Rahul)
February 16, 2022 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/14/2022 - Afternoon Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 6. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/11/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 5. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/10/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/9/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 3. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/8/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 2. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 2/7/2022 - A.M. Session, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Viola S. Zborowski. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notice of Filing of Transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 14, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 6. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 11, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 5. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 10. 2020, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 4. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 9, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 3. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 8, 2020, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 2. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 16, 2022 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 7, 2022, before Judge Steve C Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Melissa Brock. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing of transcript) Modified on 2/17/2022 to remove QC date (ddm).
February 15, 2022 Filing 105 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel J. Hessel Pro Hac Vice.by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA. (Pearson, Albert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 15, 2022 Filing 104 APPLICATION for Admission of Theresa J. Lee Pro Hac Vice.by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA. (Pearson, Albert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 15, 2022 Filing 103 APPLICATION for Admission of Ruth M. Greenwood Pro Hac Vice.by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA. (Pearson, Albert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 COORDINATED ORDER directing the parties to file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 18, 2022. Parties are further ORDERED to file their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law to CM/ECF and e-mail a word copy the Court's Courtroom Deputy (see order for contact information). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/14/2022. (ddm) Modified on 2/15/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 14, 2022 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Judicial Notice with Brief In Support by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting the #99 Defendant's Motion to Extend the Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant's answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on or before February 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/11/2022. (ddm)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #95 Unopposed MOTION for Judicial Notice. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/11/2022. (pdw)
February 10, 2022 Filing 99 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
February 10, 2022 RETURN of #91 APPLICATION for Admission of Ruth M. Greenwood Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11569828). to attorney for correction re: Incorrect Local Counsel Address. (nmb)
February 10, 2022 RETURN of #93 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel J. Hessel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11569912). to attorney for correction re: Incorrect Local Counsel Address and Courts. (nmb)
February 10, 2022 RETURN of #92 APPLICATION for Admission of Theresa J. Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11569886). to attorney for correction re: Incorrect Local Counsel Address. (nmb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE Of Filing of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (Garabadu, Rahul)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - In light of the Supreme Court's decision this Court hereby ORDERS theparties to arrive to court tomorrow morning prepared to discuss whether thisCourt should continue to hold the current hearing regarding Plaintiffs' motionsfor preliminary injunctions. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/7/2022. (pdw)
February 6, 2022 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Judicial Notice with Brief In Support by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
February 4, 2022 Filing 94 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulated Facts for Preliminary Injunction Proceedings) by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
February 4, 2022 Filing 93 APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel J. Hessel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11569912).by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA. (Pearson, Albert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 4, 2022 Filing 92 APPLICATION for Admission of Theresa J. Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11569886).by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA. (Pearson, Albert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 4, 2022 Filing 91 APPLICATION for Admission of Ruth M. Greenwood Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11569828).by Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School, Fair Districts GA. (Pearson, Albert) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 4, 2022 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae with Brief In Support by Fair Districts GA, Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School. (Attachments: #1 Brief [Proposed] Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs)(Pearson, Albert)
February 4, 2022 Filing 89 Expert Report of Gina Wright by Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 Filing 88 Expert Report of Lynn Bailey by Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 Filing 87 Expert Report of John R. Alford, Ph.D. by Brad Raffensperger.(Tyson, Bryan)
February 4, 2022 COURT'S NOTICE REGARDING THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SCHEDULED TO COMMENCE ON FEBRUARY 7, 2022 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 1907: As part of the Court's COVID-19 safety protocols, a maximum of 24 non-party observers will be permitted to attend. A maximum of 7 members of press will be permitted to sit in the jury box; however, entrance to and egress from the jury box will be limited to prior to start of court and during breaks only. COURTROOM 2105 WILL BE USED FOR OVERFLOW SEATING, WITH A LIVE AUDIO STREAM PROVIDED. (pdw) Modified on 2/4/2022 (pdw).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 COORDINATED ORDER regarding Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' witnesses and exhibits #78 . The Court declines to rule on these objections prior to the preliminary injunction hearing. The Court instructs Defendants to raise their objections to a specific exhibit when Plaintiffs move to introduce the exhibit into evidence. At that time, the Court will rule on the Defendants' objection to that particular exhibit. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/03/2022. (ddm)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER directing Defendant to file on the docket expert reports by Lynn Bailey, Gina Wright, and Dr. John Alford by no later than 12:00 p.m. (EST) on Friday, February 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/03/2022. (ddm)
February 3, 2022 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 Emergency MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #71 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel E. Weitzman. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #67 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taeyoung Kim. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 2/7/2022 -2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM: laptops and/or cellular telephones that may contain cameras, including iPhones, Androids, or other smart phones/personal digital assistants (PDAs): Rahul Garabadu; Sophia Lakin; Ari Savitzky; Jennesa Calvo-Friedman; Sean Young; Kelsey Miller; Brett Schratz; Iyanna Barker; Debo Adegbile; George Varghese; Robert Boone; Edward Williams; Anuradha Sivaram; DeEricka Aiken; Ayana Williams; Abigail Shaw; Alex Miller; Cassandra Mitchell; Tae Kim; Denise Tsai; Maura Douglas; Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner; Samuel Weitzman; Matthew Howard; Leighton Crawford; and Lenise Jennings. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #72 Plaintiffs' Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 2/04/2022 - 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM: laptops and cellular telephones that may contain cameras, including iPhones, Androids, or other smart phones/personal digital assistants (PDAs), external hard drives, mice, presentation remotes, adapters, tech table, hdmi signal switch, and related peripherals: Randall Carter; Anthony Barko. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 2/3/2022. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 Emergency MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
February 3, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #71 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel E. Weitzman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11557092).. Attorney Samuel Weitzman added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
February 3, 2022 Submission of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed), to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
February 3, 2022 Submission of #75 Emergency MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rsg)
February 2, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Witnesses and Exhibits by Brad Raffensperger re #66 Order, (Tyson, Bryan)
February 2, 2022 Filing 77 Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Objections to Defendants Exhibits by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Modified on 2/3/2022 to edit docket tetx (ddm).
February 2, 2022 Filing 76 Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Objections to Defendants Witnesses by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Modified on 2/3/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 2, 2022 Filing 75 Emergency MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony with Brief In Support by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Thereto, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
February 1, 2022 Filing 74 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
February 1, 2022 Filing 73 RESPONSE to #61 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Barber Report in Rose v. Raffensperger, #2 Exhibit B - Amicus Brief Joined by Georgia in Merrill v. Milligan)(Tyson, Bryan) Modified on 2/1/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
February 1, 2022 Filing 72 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
February 1, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #67 APPLICATION for Admission of Taeyoung Kim Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Taeyoung Kim added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 71 APPLICATION for Admission of Samuel E. Weitzman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11557092).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 31, 2022 Filing 70 Exhibit List by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bishop Reginald T. Jackson, #2 Declaration of of Sherman Lofton Jr.)(Garabadu, Rahul)
January 31, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' Lists of Witnesses and Exhibits by Brad Raffensperger re #66 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 14 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 31, #26 Exhibit 32, #27 Exhibit 33, #28 Exhibit 34, #29 Exhibit 35, #30 Exhibit 36, #31 Exhibit 37)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 31, 2022 Filing 68 Witness List by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
January 31, 2022 Filing 67 APPLICATION for Admission of Taeyoung Kim Pro Hac Vice.by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying #43 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant's request for certification of this ruling for immediate appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is denied. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. (ddm)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 COORDINATED ORDER issued for purposes of perfecting the record as to the February 7-14, 2022 coordinated in-person hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for specifics on pre-hearing deadlines, stipulations, hearing schedule and covid-19 mitigation protocols. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. (ddm) Modified on 1/28/2022 to edit signature date (ddm).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #60 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cassandra Mitchell. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #44 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abigail Shaw. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/27/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 27, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #60 APPLICATION for Admission of Cassandra Mitchell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11538422).. Attorney Cassandra Mitchell added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc. (gas)
January 26, 2022 Filing 62 Parties' Consolidated Presentation Schedule by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
January 25, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods of Supplemental Authority in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Rose v. Raffensperger, #2 Exhibit B- Singleton v. Merrill)(Garabadu, Rahul)
January 24, 2022 Filing 60 APPLICATION for Admission of Cassandra Mitchell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11538422).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 21, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #44 APPLICATION for Admission of Abigail Shaw Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11523339).. Attorney Abigail Shaw added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) filed by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Edward Williams, Esq., #2 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Cooper Declaration (Part 1), #3 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Cooper Declaration (Part 2), #4 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Cooper Declaration (Part 3), #5 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Cooper Declaration (Part 4), #6 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Cooper Declaration (Part 5), #7 Exhibit B - Rebuttal Handley Declaration)(Garabadu, Rahul)
January 20, 2022 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Tyson, Bryan)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #42 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Boone. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ayana Williams. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #35 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/20/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 20, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #41 APPLICATION for Admission of Ayana Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11518889).. Attorney Ayana Williams added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 20, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #42 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Boone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11519211).. Attorney Robert Boone added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 20, 2022 RETURN of #38 APPLICATION for Admission of Taeyoung Kim Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction re: Unable to Confirm Bar Membership. (nmb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 COORDINATED ORDER advising that for any and every case in which the Court does not grant the motion to dismiss and does not thereafter grant a request for interlocutory appeal or a request to stay, the Court will hold a coordinated, in-person preliminary injunction hearing regarding the pending motions for preliminary injunction in those cases. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, the parties collectively will have up to six (6) days to present evidence and arguments. The presenting parties may choose not to use all six days. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, it will take place in the Richard B. Russell Federal Building and United States Courthouse (courtroom to be determined) and begin at 9:00 A.M. (EST) on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 7, 2022. If the parties opt to use all six days, the hearing will take place each following business day from 9:00 A.M. to 5:00 P.M. until the overall conclusion of the hearing at 5:00 P.M. on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 14, 2022. The parties shall file with the Court a consolidated presentation schedule by no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 26, 2022. If any preliminary injunction hearing occurs, the parties in cases with still-pending motions for preliminary injunction shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by no later than 5:00 P.M. (EST) on MONDAY, FEBRUARY 21, 2022. The proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be specific to each case and motion. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/19/2022. (ddm)
January 19, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #35 APPLICATION for Admission of Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of of Maura Douglas. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George P. Varghese. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eliot Kim. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward Williams. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Denise Tsai. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of De'Ericka Aiken. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ari J. Savitzky. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/18/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 18, 2022 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Corrected) filed by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
January 18, 2022 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
January 18, 2022 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed), #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dec. of John Morgan, #2 Exhibit B - Dec. of Michael Barnes)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 18, 2022 Filing 44 APPLICATION for Admission of Abigail Shaw Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11523339).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 14, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 14, 2022 Filing 42 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Boone Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11519211).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 14, 2022 Filing 41 APPLICATION for Admission of Ayana Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11518889).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 13, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (McGowan, Charlene)
January 13, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) with Brief In Support by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Thereto, #2 Declaration of Edward Williams In Support Thereto, #3 Exhibit A - Cooper Declaration (Part 1), #4 Exhibit A - Cooper Declaration (Part 2), #5 Exhibit A - Cooper Declaration (Part 3), #6 Exhibit A - Cooper Declaration (Part 4), #7 Exhibit B - Dr. Handley Report, #8 Exhibit C - Dr. Jones Report, #9 Exhibit D - Dr. Burch Report, #10 Exhibit E - Dr. Ward Report, #11 Exhibit F - Glenn Declaration, #12 Exhibit G - Brown Declaration, #13 Exhibit H - Stewart Declaration, #14 Exhibit I - Woods Declaration, #15 Exhibit J - Lofton, Jr. Declaration, #16 Exhibit K - Bishop Jackson Declaration, #17 Exhibit L - House Guidelines, #18 Exhibit M - Senate Guidelines, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
January 13, 2022 Filing 38 APPLICATION for Admission of Taeyoung Kim Pro Hac Vice.by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 13, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Eliot Kim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503714).. Attorney Eliot Kim added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 12, 2022 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Rule 16 conference held via Zoom in Alpha Phi Alpha v. Raffensperger, 1:21-cv-5337-SCJ; Georgia State Conference of the NAACP et al v. State of Georgia, 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Pendergrass v. Raffensperger, 1:21-CV-5339-SCJ; Common Cause et al v. Raffensperger, 1:22-cv-00090-SCJ-SDG-ELB; Grant v. Raffensperger, 1:22-CV-0122-SCJ. (Court Reporter Viola Zbrowski)(pdw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting motion(s) and briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 14,2022.Plaintiffs shall file their response, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM on January 18, 2022. Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by no later than 5:00 PM on January 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022.(pdw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER setting motion(s) and briefing schedule: Plaintiffs shall file their amended motion for a preliminary injunction/ if any/ by no later than 2:00 PM EST on January 13,2022. Defendant shall file their response/ if any/ by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 18, 2022. Plaintiffs shall file their reply/ if any/ by no later than 5:00 PM EST on January 20, 2022. Signed Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. (pdw)
January 12, 2022 Filing 35 APPLICATION for Admission of Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner Pro Hac Vice.by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Debo Patrick Adegbile. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennesa Calvo-Friedman. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/12/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of George P. Varghese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503736).. Attorney George P. Varghese added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 12, 2022 RETURN of #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Taeyoung Kim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503765). to attorney for correction re: courts. (nmb)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Ari J. Savitzky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503305).. Attorney Ari J. Savitzky added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Debo Patrick Adegbile Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503641).. Attorney Debo P. Adegbile added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennesa Calvo-Friedman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503383).. Attorney Jennesa Calvo-Friedman added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of De'Ericka Aiken Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503661).. Attorney De'Ericka Aiken added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Maura Douglas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503753).. Attorney Maura Douglas added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503698).. Attorney Edward Williams added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 12, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Denise Tsai Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503679).. Attorney Denise Tsai added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anuradha Sivaram. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/11/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alex W Miller. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/11/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sophia Lin Lakin. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/11/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdw)
January 11, 2022 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Status Report by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2022 Election Calendar, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from B. Evans regarding redistricting)(Tyson, Bryan)
January 11, 2022 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
January 11, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Alex W Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503536).. Attorney Alex W. Miller added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 11, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Anuradha Sivaram Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503604).. Attorney Anuradha Sivaram added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (gas)
January 11, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503263).. Attorney Sophia Lin Lakin added appearing on behalf of Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods (nmb)
January 11, 2022 RETURN of #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503630). to attorney for correction re: specify admitted courts. (gas)
January 10, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Notice of Errata) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William S. Cooper, #2 Exhibit O to Declaration, #3 Exhibit S-1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit T-1 to Declaration)(Garabadu, Rahul)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER AMENDING #8 Order setting Rule 16 Conference for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom (connection instructions to remain as previously issued). The parties are further ORDERED to file by 12:00 p.m. EST on TUESDAY, JANUARY 11, 2022, status report(s) explaining their positions with respect to the issues set forth in the Courts prior order at Doc. No. #8 after conferring with the parties in 1:21-cv-05338-ELB-SCJ-SDG; 1:21-cv-05339-SCJ; and 1:22-cv-00090-ELB-SCJ-SDG. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/10/2022. (pdw)
January 7, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Edward William in Support, #3 Exhibit A Part 1 - Report of William S. Cooper, #4 Exhibit A Part 2 - Report of William S. Cooper, #5 Exhibit A Part 3 - Report of William S. Cooper, #6 Exhibit A Part 4 - Report of William S. Cooper, #7 Exhibit B - Report of Dr. Lisa Handley, #8 Exhibit C - Report of Dr. Adrienne Jones, #9 Exhibit D - Report of Dr. Traci Burch, #10 Exhibit E - Report of Dr. Jason Morgan Ward, #11 Exhibit F - Declaration of Katie Bailey Glenn, #12 Exhibit G - Declaration of Phil S. Brown, #13 Exhibit H - Declaration of Janice Stewart, #14 Exhibit I - Declaration of Eric Woods, #15 Exhibit J - Declaration of Sherman Lofton, Jr., #16 Exhibit K - Declaration of Bishop Reginald T. Jackson, #17 Exhibit L - 2021 Guidelines for the House Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Committee, #18 Exhibit M - 2021 Guidelines for the Senate Redistricting Committee, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
January 7, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Strickland, Frank)
January 7, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Paradise, Loree Anne)
January 7, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Jacoutot, Bryan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Taeyoung Kim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503765).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Maura Douglas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503753).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of George P. Varghese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503736).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Eliot Kim Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503714).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503698).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Denise Tsai Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503679).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of De'Ericka Aiken Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503661).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Debo Patrick Adegbile Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503641).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503630).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Anuradha Sivaram Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503604).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Alex W Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503536).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennesa Calvo-Friedman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503383).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Ari J. Savitzky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503305).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11503263).by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom (connection instructions to follow by separate notice.) The parties are further ORDERED to file by 12:00 p.m. EST on TUESDAY,JANUARY 11, 2022, status report(s) explaining their positions with respect to the issues (set forth herein.) Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/06/2022. (pdw) Modified on 1/6/2022 (pdw).
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Phil Brown, Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Eric T. Woods, Katie Bailey Glenn, Janice Stewart. Brad Raffensperger served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Garabadu, Rahul)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Garabadu, Rahul)
January 6, 2022 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING: RULE 16 CONFERENCE set for 1/12/2022 at 01:30 PM via Zoom before Judge Steve C. Jones, Judge Elizabeth Branch, and Judge Steven Grimberg. Connection Instructions: Topic: Rule 16 Conference: 1:21-cv-05337-SCJ; 1:21-cv-05338-SCJ-SDG-ELB; and 1:21-cv-05339-SCJ Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1605120572 Passcode: 851671 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# or +16468287666,,1605120572#,,,,*851671# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 or +1 551 285 1373 or +1 669 216 1590 Webinar ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 International numbers available: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/abdGvu42dG Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 161.199.138.10 (US West) or 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 160 512 0572 Passcode: 851671 SIP: 1605120572@sip.zoomgov.com Passcode: 851671 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw) Modified on 1/6/2022 (pdw).
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. If Plaintiffs file a motion for preliminary injunction, its brief shall be no longer than thirty-five (35) pages. Because Defendant has not moved for such a page extension for any response it may file, this Order shall not be construed as granting Defendant a reciprocal ten-page extension. The Court will consider a page-extension request from Defendant if one is filed. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 01/05/2022. (rsg)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Phil Brown, Katie Bailey Glenn, Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Janice Stewart, Eric T. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garabadu, Rahul)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Tyson, Bryan)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (lwb)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief filed by Phil Brown, Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc., Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church, Eric T. Woods, Katie Bailey Glenn, Janice Stewart. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11487582). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc. et al v. Raffensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpha Phi Alpha Fraternity, Inc.
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Abigail Shaw
Represented By: Alex W. Miller
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Ayana Williams
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner
Represented By: De'Ericka Aiken
Represented By: Denise Tsai
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Represented By: Eliot Kim
Represented By: Jennesa Calvo-Friedman
Represented By: Maura Douglas
Represented By: Robert Boone
Represented By: Samuel Weitzman
Represented By: Taeyoung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sixth District of the African Methodist Episcopal Church
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Abigail Shaw
Represented By: Alex W. Miller
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Ayana Williams
Represented By: Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner
Represented By: Jennesa Calvo-Friedman
Represented By: De'Ericka Aiken
Represented By: Denise Tsai
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Represented By: Eliot Kim
Represented By: Maura Douglas
Represented By: Robert Boone
Represented By: Samuel Weitzman
Represented By: Taeyoung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric T. Woods
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Abigail Shaw
Represented By: Alex W. Miller
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Ayana Williams
Represented By: Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner
Represented By: De'Ericka Aiken
Represented By: Denise Tsai
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Represented By: Eliot Kim
Represented By: Jennesa Calvo-Friedman
Represented By: Maura Douglas
Represented By: Robert Boone
Represented By: Samuel Weitzman
Represented By: Taeyoung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Bailey Glenn
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Abigail Shaw
Represented By: Alex W. Miller
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Ayana Williams
Represented By: Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner
Represented By: De'Ericka Aiken
Represented By: Denise Tsai
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Represented By: Eliot Kim
Represented By: Jennesa Calvo-Friedman
Represented By: Maura Douglas
Represented By: Robert Boone
Represented By: Samuel Weitzman
Represented By: Taeyoung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Brown
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Abigail Shaw
Represented By: Alex W. Miller
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Ayana Williams
Represented By: Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner
Represented By: De'Ericka Aiken
Represented By: Denise Tsai
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Represented By: Eliot Kim
Represented By: Jennesa Calvo-Friedman
Represented By: Maura Douglas
Represented By: Robert Boone
Represented By: Samuel Weitzman
Represented By: Taeyoung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Stewart
Represented By: Debo P. Adegbile
Represented By: George P. Varghese
Represented By: Rahul Garabadu
Represented By: Sean Young
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Abigail Shaw
Represented By: Alex W. Miller
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Represented By: Ari J. Savitzky
Represented By: Ayana Williams
Represented By: Charlotte Geaghan-Breiner
Represented By: De'Ericka Aiken
Represented By: Denise Tsai
Represented By: Edward Henderson Williams, II
Represented By: Eliot Kim
Represented By: Jennesa Calvo-Friedman
Represented By: Maura Douglas
Represented By: Robert Boone
Represented By: Samuel Weitzman
Represented By: Taeyoung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Districts GA
Represented By: Ruth M. Greenwood
Represented By: Theresa J. Lee
Represented By: Albert Matthews Pearson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Election Law Clinic at Harvard Law School
Represented By: Ruth M. Greenwood
Represented By: Theresa J. Lee
Represented By: Albert Matthews Pearson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?