In Re Rule 45 Subpoena Directed to Non-Party Equifax Inc.
Plaintiff: Financialapps, LLC
Defendant: Envestnet, Inc. and Yodlee, Inc.
Petitioner: Equifax Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021mi00027
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot and without prejudice #1 Motion to Quash/Motion for Protective Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/29/2021. (jta)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF re #1 EMERGENCY MOTION to Quash Subpoena MOTION for Protective Order filed by Equifax Inc.. (Houser, Donald)
April 29, 2021 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (jta)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 Withdrawal of Motion #4 MOTION for Joinder in Non-Party Equifax Inc's Memorandum of Law in Support of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order filed by Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc. filed by Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc.. (Gieser, Caroline)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Amy Yongmee Cho. Clerk to follow-up by 5/10/2021. (cdg)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joshua Hollander. Clerk to follow-up by 5/10/2021. (cdg)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 EMERGENCY MOTION to Quash Subpoena MOTION for Protective Order / FinancialApps, LLC's Opposition to Non-Party Equifax Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoena and For Protective Order filed by Financialapps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Correspondence)(Davenport, Andrew) Modified on 4/30/2021 case should have been converted to CV, but order was issued closing mi case prior to conversion (rvb).
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Joinder in Non-Party Equifax Inc's Memorandum of Law in Support of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Envestnet, Inc., Yodlee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Letter to the Hon. Christopher J. Burke)(Gieser, Caroline) Modified on 4/26/2021 to relate to document #1 and remove all caps (bdb).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: So that the Court can be fully apprised of the parties' positions with respect to the issues raised in Equifax's motion, it is ORDERED that Equifax's obligations to comply with the subpoena are STAYED pending further order of the Court. To avoid unnecessary delay, the Court ORDERS expedited briefing on Equifax's emergency motion. If parties wish to file a brief in opposition, they must do so by Tuesday, April 27, 2021 at 5:00 PM (EDT). Any reply in support must be filed by Thursday, April 29, 2021, at 5:00 PM (EDT). The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned following the expiration of the above period. Counsel for Equifax is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order on counsel for the parties via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 4/22/2021. (jta)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021. (jkb)
April 22, 2021 Submission of #1 EMERGENCY MOTION to Quash Subpoena and MOTION for Protective Order, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (jkb)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION to Quash Subpoena, MOTION for Protective Order by Equifax Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb)
April 20, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49, receipt number AGANDC-10915156 (jkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Rule 45 Subpoena Directed to Non-Party Equifax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envestnet, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Yongmee Cho
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yodlee, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Yongmee Cho
Represented By: Caroline Gieser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Donald MacKaye Houser
Represented By: Troy Stram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financialapps, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Hollander
Represented By: Andrew Alan Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?