Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Lazer Spot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Lazer Spot, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021mi00033
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Application for an Order to Show Cause by Lazer Spot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adler, Bradley)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 7/6/2021 for defendant to respond to #1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Administrative Subpoena Should Not Be Enforced. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/15/2021. (adg)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Application for an Order to Show Cause re: #1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Administrative Subpoena Should Not Be Enforced by Lazer Spot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Adler, Bradley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Gosch on behalf of Lazer Spot, Inc. (Gosch, Hannah)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley T. Adler on behalf of Lazer Spot, Inc. (Adler, Bradley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sri Hemanth Digumarthi on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Digumarthi, Sri)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Flegal, Robyn)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF to serve Respondent with a copy of this ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, along with the its Application and Memorandum in Support, on or before June 7, 2021, and file a proof of service in compliance with Rule 4(l) of the FRCVP. Process server Garfield Trumble of Metro Legal Support is hereby specially appointed to make this service. Respondent shall file and serve its answer to the Application and response to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support within (21) days from the date it is served. If Respondent files an answer and response, Plaintiff shall then have 14) days within which to file any reply. Once briefing is complete, the Court may, in its discretion, decide to hold a hearing if either party requests one. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 05/20/2021. (bdb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Administrative Subpoena Should Not Be Enforced, by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #3 Supplement Declaration Attachment 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #4 Supplement Declaration Attachment 2 - Notice of Charge, #5 Supplement Declaration Attachment 3 - May 11, 2020 Email EEOC to R, #6 Supplement Declaration Attachment 4 - February 22, 2021 RFI Email EEOC to R, #7 Supplement Declaration Attachment 5, #8 Supplement Declaration Attachment 6 - Howard-Cooper v. Lazerspot Subpoena, #9 Supplement Declaration Attachment 7 - March 16, 2021 Email EEOC to R serving sub, #10 Exhibit 2 - March 19 Email EEOC to R, #11 Exhibit 3 - March 29 Email EEOC to R (First Email), #12 Exhibit 4 - March 29 Email EEOC to R (Second Email), #13 Exhibit 5 - March 30 Email EEOC to R, #14 Exhibit 6 - April 8 Email EEOC to R, #15 Exhibit 7 - April 8 Email R to EEOC, #16 Exhibit 8 - April 8 Email EEOC to R (Second), #17 Exhibit 9 - April 19 Email EEOC to R, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(rvb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2021: #19 Civil Cover Sheet) (rvb). Modified on 5/6/2021 to update motion text (rvb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Lazer Spot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazer Spot, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Gosch
Represented By: Bradley T. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Robyn Margaret Flegal
Represented By: Sri Hemanth Digumarthi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?